Porter v. First Bankshares, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sherrie N. Porter
Defendant: First Bankshares, Inc., The First State Bank of Barboursville, Phillip Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Robert Jackson Dilley, Daniel T. Yon, Ronald W. Woodell, Michael S. Lunsford, Any and All Other Unnamed and To Be Determined Directors Thereof, Guyan Holding Company, First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, The First Company and West Virginia Development Loan Fund, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00464
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/3/2021. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/4/2022 and all depositions by 5/19/2022; granting a stay of discovery for the duration of the pendency of Defendants' #7 and #9 MOTIONS to Dismiss and Plaintiff's #11 MOTION to Remand; this stay will not alter the 5/19/2022 discovery completion date. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 3/21/2022, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 4/19/2022, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 5/5/2022. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/8/2022; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 6/20/2022. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 8/29/2022. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2022 at 10:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 9/20/2022. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 9/26/2022 in Huntington. Trial set for 9/27/2022 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further CANCELING the scheduling conference set for 10/18/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/13/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by W. Stephen Flesher on behalf of Sherrie N. Porter. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harbour, Paula)
October 6, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY by Robert Jackson Dilley, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon to Plaintiff's #13 Response in Opposition. (Adkins, J.) (Modified on 10/6/2021 to remove the link to the #7 motion and #8 memorandum and add link to the #13 response) (mkw).
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY by First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company to Plaintiff's #15 RESPONSE in Opposition. (Adkins, J.) (Modified on 10/6/2021 to remove link to #9 motion and #10 memorandum and add link to the #15 response) (mkw).
October 4, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Robert Jackson Dilley, First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon in opposition to #11 MOTION by Sherrie N. Porter to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County. (Adkins, J.) (Modified on 10/4/2021 to remove link to #12 memorandum in support) (mkw).
October 4, 2021 Filing 17 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Sherrie N. Porter, Robert Jackson Dilley, First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon. (Adkins, J.) (Modified on 10/4/2021 to add party filer) (mkw).
September 30, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Sherrie N. Porter to #15 RESPONSE by Sherrie N. Porter to #9 MOTION by First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Harbour, Paula) (Modified on 10/1/2021 to remove link to #10 memorandum and add link to #15 response) (mkw).
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Sherrie N. Porter to #9 MOTION by First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Harbour, Paula) (Modified on 10/1/2021 to remove link to #10 memorandum) (mkw).
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Sherrie N. Porter to #13 RESPONSE by Sherrie N. Porter in opposition to #7 MOTION by Robert Jackson Dilley, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Harbour, Paula) (Modified on 10/1/2021 to remove link to #8 memorandum and add link to #13 response) (mkw).
September 30, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Sherrie N. Porter in opposition to #7 MOTION by Robert Jackson Dilley, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Harbour, Paula) (Modified on 10/1/2021 to remove link to #8 memorandum) (mkw).
September 20, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 MOTION. Error: Incorrect image attached. Correction: Replaced incorrect image with correct image. (mkw)
September 19, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Sherrie N. Porter in support of #11 MOTION by Sherrie N. Porter to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County. (Harbour, Paula)
September 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Sherrie N. Porter to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Cabell County. (Harbour, Paula) (Modified on 9/20/2021 to replace image) (mkw).
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company in support of #9 MOTION by First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Adkins, J.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION by First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Adkins, J.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Robert Jackson Dilley, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon in support of #7 MOTION by Robert Jackson Dilley, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Adkins, J.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION by Robert Jackson Dilley, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: Complaint attached to the #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Adkins, J.)
September 13, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Error: The image was upside down. Correction: Replaced upside down image with upright image. (mkw)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Sherrie N. Porter of Defendants The First State Bank of Barboursville, The First Company and West Virginia Development Loan Fund, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Harbour, Paula) (Modified on 9/13/2021 to replace image) (mkw).
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 9/15/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 9/27/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 10/4/2021. Scheduling/status conference at 11:30 AM on 10/18/2021 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order - 10/25/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 11/1/2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/26/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (hkl)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Jackson Dilley, Michael S. Lunsford, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Phillip Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Ronald W. Woodell, Daniel T. Yon.(Adkins, J.) (Modified on 8/27/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mkw).
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Bankshares Trust Preferred I, First Bankshares, Inc., Guyan Holding Company.(Adkins, J.) (Modified on 8/27/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (mkw).
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (hkl)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Bankshares, Inc., Phillip Vallandingham, P. Andrew Vallandingham, Samuel Vallandingham, Jeanne P. Vallandingham, Stephanie V. Mayberry, Robert Jackson Dilley, Daniel T. Yon, Ronald W. Woodell, Michael S. Lunsford, Guyan Holding Company, and First Bankshares Trust Preferred I with summonses, complaint, civil case information statement, and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Cabell County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8014760. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (hkl)
August 19, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. First Bankshares, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie N. Porter
Represented By: Paula L. Harbour
Represented By: W. Stephen Flesher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bankshares, Inc.
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First State Bank of Barboursville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Vallandingham
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Andrew Vallandingham
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Vallandingham
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne P. Vallandingham
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie V. Mayberry
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jackson Dilley
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel T. Yon
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald W. Woodell
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Lunsford
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and All Other Unnamed and To Be Determined Directors Thereof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guyan Holding Company
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bankshares Trust Preferred I
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The First Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Development Loan Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?