Mayes v. Kenova Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Dale Mayes
Defendant: Kenova Police Department and Wayne County Circuit Court
Case Number: 3:2021cv00499
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Error: Plaintiff's name was incorrect on the image. Correction: Replaced incorrect image with correct image. (mkw)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order and cure the various deficiencies in pleading as indicated herein; Plaintiff is hereby given notice that a failure to amend the complaint as ordered may result in a recommendation that the complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim and/or for failure to prosecute; Plaintiff's #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs shall be held in abeyance pending initial review of Plaintiff's amended complaint or pending other further proceedings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/8/2021. (cc: Plaintiff) (jsa) (Modified on 9/10/2021 to replace image) (mkw).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 APPLICATION by Rodney Dale Mayes to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayes v. Kenova Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Dale Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenova Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?