Hall et al v. Putnam County Commission et al
Plaintiff: Angela Hall and Erik Hall
Defendant: Putnam County Commission, Deputy Sheriff Heather D. Grimmett and Deputy Sheriff B.W. Pauley
Case Number: 3:2022cv00277
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE by Angela Hall, Erik Hall in opposition to #11 MOTION by Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Circuit Court Order, #2 Exhibit - Formal Complaint, #3 Exhibit - DHHR Letter and Findings (redacted))(Griffith, Travis) (Modified on 8/30/2022 to remove link to #12 memorandum) (mkw).
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE by Angela Hall, Erik Hall in opposition #9 MOTION by Putnam County Commission to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Circuit Court Order, #2 Exhibit - Formal Complaint, #3 Exhibit - DHHR Letter and Findings (redacted), #4 Exhibit - Dillon Complaint)(Griffith, Travis) (Modified on 8/30/2022 to remove link to #10 memorandum) (mkw).
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley in support of #11 MOTION by Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Vanston, Benjamin)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vanston, Benjamin) (Modified on 8/23/2022 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Putnam County Commission in support of #9 MOTION by Putnam County Commission to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Vanston, Benjamin)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Putnam County Commission to Dismiss With Prejudice, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vanston, Benjamin) (Modified on 8/23/2022 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Benjamin Brice Vanston on behalf of Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley, Putnam County Commission. (Vanston, Benjamin)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 8/18/2022. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 8/29/2022. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 9/6/2022. Scheduling/status conference at 11:30 AM on 9/19/2022 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order - 9/26/2022. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 10/3/2022. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/1/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (cla)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley, Putnam County Commission (Greve, Wendy)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley, Putnam County Commission; with jury demand.(Greve, Wendy) (Modified on 8/1/2022 to add jury demand) (ts).
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley, Putnam County Commission, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 summons as to Heather Grimmet, #2 summons as to B.W. Pauley) (jsa)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Erik Hall, Angela Hall for Heather D. Grimmett, B.W. Pauley, Putnam County Commission, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons for Defendant Grimmett, #2 Proposed Summons for Defendant Pauley)(Griffith, Travis) (Modified on 7/7/2022 to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cla)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8223590. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cla) (Modified on 7/6/2022 to replace Exhibits A and B) (mkw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Putnam County Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hall
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Hall
Represented By: Travis A. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Putnam County Commission
Represented By: Benjamin Brice Vanston
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Heather D. Grimmett
Represented By: Benjamin Brice Vanston
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff B.W. Pauley
Represented By: Benjamin Brice Vanston
Represented By: Wendy E. Greve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?