Workman v. Hockley et al
Plaintiff: Tommy Ray Workman, Jr.
Defendant: Correctional Officer Hockley and Sergeant York
Case Number: 3:2023cv00118
Filed: February 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 5/3/2023. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 5/15/2023. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 5/22/2023. Scheduling/status conference at 11:30 AM on 6/5/2023 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order - 6/12/2023. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 6/20/2023. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/13/2023. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (cla)
April 11, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hockley, York; Jury demand. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Horter, Josef)
March 28, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Sergeant York. Sergeant York served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Summons served on Sergeant York. (Stroebel, Paul)
March 28, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for C.O. Hockley. C.O. Hockley served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Summons served on C.O. Hockley. (Stroebel, Paul)
March 16, 2023 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Correctional Officer Hockley, Sergeant York, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 summons as to Sergeant York) (jsa)
March 14, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Tommy Ray Workman, Jr. for Hockley, York, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons)(Stroebel, Paul)
February 14, 2023 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cla)
February 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8364718. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cla)
February 13, 2023 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workman v. Hockley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Ray Workman, Jr.
Represented By: Paul E. Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Hockley
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: Josef A. Horter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant York
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: Josef A. Horter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?