The W.J. Maier Storage Company v. Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: The W.J. Maier Storage Company
Defendant: Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc. and Possehl Erzkontor N.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00524
Filed: September 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert C Chambers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME by The W.J. Maier Storage Company, Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc.; the parties stipulate and agree that the time for Defendant Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc. shall have to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff The W.J. Maier Storage Company's #1 Complaint is extended to Monday, December 9, 2024. (Humphrey, Blake) (Modified on 11/21/2024 to add party filer and to add link to #1 complaint) (mkw).
November 21, 2024 Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc. answer due 12/9/2024 pursuant to the #6 Stipulation. (mkw)
October 1, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Blake N. Humphrey on 09/30/2024. Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc. waiver mailed on 9/26/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (Reynolds, Kayla)
September 25, 2024 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
September 25, 2024 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED SEPTEMBER 1, 2024. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph K. Reeder. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (jsa)
September 25, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff The W.J. Maier Storage Company. (jsa)
September 25, 2024 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (jsa)
September 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8739596. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The W.J. Maier Storage Company v. Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cremer Erzkontor N.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Blake N. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Possehl Erzkontor N.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Blake N. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The W.J. Maier Storage Company
Represented By: Kayla Stickley Reynolds
Represented By: Isaac Ralston Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?