Azeez v. Keller et al
Case Number: 5:2006cv00106
Filed: February 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Beckley Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas E. Johnston
Presiding Judge: R. Clarke VanDervort
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: that the 187 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendants Kristen Keller, Lawrence Frail, Bruce Lazenby, Cedric Robertson and David Cook be Granted; denying Plaintiff's 129 and 199 MOTIONS for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court further ORDERS that all pending motions in this matter be TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/6/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cds)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: that the Magistrate Judge's 151 Proposed Findings and Recommendations be Adopted; the Court Orders that the 51 Motion to Dismiss on behalf of Francis M. Curnutte, III be Granted; the Court further Orders that the 39 Motion to Dismiss on behalf of David H. Cook, Kristen L. Keller, Janice B. Davis, Bruce K. Lazenby, Lawrence Frail, Cedric Robertson, Billy Cole be Granted In Part and Denied In Part. The Court Orders Plaintiff's Complaint is dism issed as to Defendants Cole and Davis. However, Plaintiff is entitled to proceed on his claim that Defendants Keller, Lazenby and Frail violated his Fourteenth Amendment right not to be deprived of liberty as a result of their fabrication of evidenc e or directing Defendants Robertson and Cook to present false testimony while acting in an investiative capacity; Further Plaintiff is entitled to proceed on his claim that Defendants Robertson and Cook violated his Fourteenth Amendment right not to be deprived of liberty as a result of their fabrication of evidence while acting in an investigative capacity, etc. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/6/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cds)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying Plaintiff's 141 MOTION to Recuse Judge Irene Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/11/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: Based on the findings herein, the Court does hereby ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's 135 Proposed Findings and Recommendation be ADOPTED. The Court ORDERS that Defendant Hutchison's 26 Motion to Dismiss and 124 Renewed Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 9/8/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mls)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: overruling Plaintiff's 104 Objections to United States Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort's 101 Order of April 1, 2010; affirming the 101 Order of April 1, 2010. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/22/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 90 MOTION for an Order of Expungement of Criminal Records; granting Defendants Cole, Cook, Davis, Lawrence Frail, Keller, Lazenby, and Robertson's 91 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for an Order of Exp ungement of Criminal Records; denying as moot Plaintiff's 100 MOTION for an Expedited Ruling on Motion for Expungement of Criminal Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 4/1/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azeez v. Keller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?