Hatfield v. United States of America
Plaintiff: David Lynn Hatfield
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2009cv00568
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Beckley Office
County: Raleigh
Presiding Judge: Thomas E. Johnston
Presiding Judge: R. Clarke VanDervort
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: adopting the 248 Proposed Findings and Recommendations; granting Petitioner's 247 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss; dismissing Petitioner's 219 Petitioner; directing the Clerk to remove the matter from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/8/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: recommending that the District Court GRANT 247 MOTION by David Lynn Hatfield to Withdraw 219 MOTION for Relief from Judgment, DISMISS the 219 MOTION by David Lynn Hatfield for Relief from Judgment, and REM OVE this matter from the Court's docket. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 5:02-00219. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 6/25/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 6/8/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER as to David Lynn Hatfield: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion for Relief from Judgment Filed on 08/21/2007, in Criminal Case No. 5:02-00219, should be construed as as a Section 2255 Motion; Directs the Clerk to open a new case indicat ing Mr. Hatfield as the Movant and the cause a 28 U.S.C. 2255 Motion to Vacate/Correct Illegal Sentence case and include a copy of the Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 5/20/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mls) Modified document number on 5/21/2009 (jkk).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatfield v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lynn Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Charles T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?