Mosley et al v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roy Mosley and Marilyn Mosley
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Sam Stewart Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv01203
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Beckley Office
County: Wyoming
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: granting 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company; granting Defendants Wachovia Mortgage Corporation and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.'s 30 MOTION for Summary Judgmen t; denying as moot Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's 47 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Alleged Hearsay Statements of Contractor(s); denying as moot Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's 49 MOTION in Limine to Ex clude Testimony Regarding Sufficiency of Repair Estimate; denying as moot Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's 51 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Notice of Non-Renewal. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/11/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court does hereby ORDER that Defendants Wachovia Mortgage Corporation's and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.'s 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 09/14/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mls)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying Plaintiffs' 11 MOTION to Remand to Circuit Court; granting Defendant Wachovia Mortgage Corporation's and Defendant Wells Fargo Home Mortgage's 7 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/1/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley et al v. Wachovia Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Mosley
Represented By: David G. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Mosley
Represented By: David G. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Teresa L. Kleeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Stewart Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa L. Kleeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?