Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, et. al. v. Lexington Insurance Company, et. al.

Plaintiff: Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc. and The Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc.
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company, Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, AG, Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd., Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc., The Underwriters at Lloyd's London, McLarens Young International, Inc. and Rocco M. Bianchi
Case Number: 5:2014cv15201
Filed: April 23, 2014
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Beckley Office
County: Greenbrier
Presiding Judge: Irene C. Berger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2018 111 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying the Plaintiff's 104 MOTION for Reconsideration of January 4, 2018 Order and Judgment Order. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/11/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
November 29, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying Plaintiffs' 80 MOTION to Vacate and Set Aside the Decision of the Appraiser/Umpire; granting the Defendants' 83 CROSS-MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Breach of Contract and Hayseed Damages; ; denying Defendants' 89 MOTION to Strike the Affidavit and Curriculum Vitae of Larry R. Weatherford and the Reply Affidavit of Marvin W. Masters. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 11/29/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
February 18, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court does ORDER that the 12 MOTION of Defendants Lexington Insurance Company, KL Insurance America, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company, and Underwriters at Lloyd's London to Dismiss, or Stay, this Litigat ion and Compel Appraisal be GRANTED, and that this matter be STAYED pending the appraisal; the parties are ORDERED to submit a status report every 30 days and immediately notify the Court upon completion of the appraisal process. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/18/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, et. al. v. Lexington Insurance Company, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenbrier Hotel Corporation
Represented By: Avrum Levicoff
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Represented By: Kimberly K. Parmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc.
Represented By: Avrum Levicoff
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Represented By: Kimberly K. Parmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc.
Represented By: Avrum Levicoff
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Represented By: Kimberly K. Parmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: James M. Dennis
Represented By: Wayne R. Glaubinger
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Dennis
Represented By: Wayne R. Glaubinger
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: James M. Dennis
Represented By: Wayne R. Glaubinger
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company Holdings, AG
Represented By: James M. Dennis
Represented By: Wayne R. Glaubinger
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: James M. Dennis
Represented By: Wayne R. Glaubinger
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: James M. Dennis
Represented By: Wayne R. Glaubinger
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: James M. Dennis
Represented By: Wayne R. Glaubinger
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLarens Young International, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocco M. Bianchi
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?