Lilly v. Discover Bank

Plaintiff: Matthew Daniel Lilly
Defendant: Discover Bank
Case Number: 5:2018cv01543
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting by Discover Bank, Matthew Daniel Lilly. ERROR: Image did not contain signature of counsel. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (ts)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Cancelling the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 2/20/2019; ordering that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 3/20/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 9/3/2019, and all depositions by 10/29/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/14/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 7/12/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/29/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/6/2019. Motions in Limine to be filed by 2/21/2020, with responses due by 2/28/2020. Proposed Jury Charges due by 4/6/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 4/7/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 4/14/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 9:00 AM on 4/22/2020 in Beckley. Jury Trial set for 4/27/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/31/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Discover Bank, Matthew Daniel Lilly. (Manley, Reid) (Modified on 1/31/2019 to add party filer and to replace unsigned image) (ts).
January 2, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Discover Bank. ERROR: Exhibit A contained an illegible page; CORRECTION: Removed and replaced incorrect image of Exhibit A. (slr).
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Discover Bank.(Manley, Reid)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/16/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/23/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/30/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 2/20/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/27/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/6/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 12/28/2018. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
December 26, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Discover Bank (Manley, Reid)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Discover Bank with summons, amended complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7005957. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm) (Modified on 1/2/2019 to remove and replace incorrect image of Exhibit A)(slr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lilly v. Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Daniel Lilly
Represented By: Jed Robert Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?