Fadlevich v. Raleigh General Hospital, LLC et al

Plaintiff: W.F., Brandy Fadlevich and Chase Fadlevich
Defendant: John Does 1-10, United States of America and Raleigh General Hospital, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00046
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER AND NOTICE: Granting the #14 Motion of the United States to Modify the #13 Order and Notice entered 02/08/2019, and Amending the Order and Notice as follows: Rule 12(b) Motions 3/25/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/3/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 4/10/2019. Scheduling Conference at 03:30 PM on 4/24/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 5/1/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 5/8/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/13/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by United States of America to Modify #13 Order and Notice (Westfall, Fred)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/28/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/14/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 3/21/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 4/4/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 4/11/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 4/18/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/8/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by Raleigh General Hospital, LLC. (Hood, S.) (Modified on 2/7/2019 to add jury demand) (ts).
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/17/2019 as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (msa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/17/2019 as to United States Attorney, Southern District of West Virginia. (msa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/17/2019 as to United States Attorney General. (msa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 1/17/2019 as to Raleigh General Hospital, LLC. (msa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to United States Attorney) (btm)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by W.F., Chase Fadlevich, Brandy Fadlevich for United States of America, (Amos, Charles)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by W.F., Chase Fadlevich, Brandy Fadlevich for United States of America, (Amos, Charles)
January 14, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to United States Attorney, #2 Summons as to United States Attorney General) (btm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Raleigh General Hospital, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (btm)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7023927. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Summons as to RGH, #4 Proposed Summons as to DHHS, #5 Proposed Summons as to Goodwin, #6 Proposed Summons as to Holder, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fadlevich v. Raleigh General Hospital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.F.
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Represented By: Charles Edward Amos, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Fadlevich
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Represented By: Charles Edward Amos, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Fadlevich
Represented By: Scott S. Segal
Represented By: Charles Edward Amos, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Fred B. Westfall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raleigh General Hospital, LLC
Represented By: S. Taylor Hood
Represented By: D. C. Offutt, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Q. Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?