Union Security Insurance Company v. White

Plaintiff: Union Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Shannon Gaye Clark, Delta Dawn Addair and Rodney White
Case Number: 5:2019cv00104
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Shannon Gaye Clark in support of #9 MOTION by Shannon Gaye Clark for Summary Judgment (Taylor, Amanda)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Shannon Gaye Clark for Summary Judgment (Taylor, Amanda)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 4/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/1/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/8/2019. Scheduling Conference at 03:00 PM on 5/29/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 6/5/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/2/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint, by Shannon Gaye Clark.(Taylor, Amanda)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Delta Dawn Addair on 03/11/2019. Delta Dawn Addair waiver mailed on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Grace, Kathryn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Grace, Kathryn)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Union Security Insurance Company (Grace, Kathryn)
February 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Proposed Summons (2),(3) and (4) not flattened. CORRECTION: Proposed Summons flattened and replaced. (msa)
February 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Delta Dawn Addair, Shannon Gaye Clark, Rodney White, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons- Clark, #2 Summons- Addair) (msa)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC7067963. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-R, #2 Proposed Summons- White, #3 Proposed Summons-Clark, #4 Proposed Summons-Addair, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa) (Modified on 2/12/2019 to remove and replace incorrect images) (msa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Security Insurance Company v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Gaye Clark
Represented By: Amanda J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Dawn Addair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?