Holler v. The Townsend Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Holler and Todd Holler
Defendant: The Townsend Corporation and Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00129
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The Townsend Corporation, Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC in support of #13 MOTION by The Townsend Corporation, Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC to Dismiss Count III of #1 Complaint (Kennedy, Gregory)
April 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by The Townsend Corporation, Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC to Dismiss Count III of #1 Complaint. (Kennedy, Gregory) (Modified on 4/21/2019 to add link to #1 complaint)(ts).
March 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 Stipulation Extending Time. ERROR: Image is a duplicate of entry #11. CORRECTION: Duplicate image removed. (ts)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 DUPLICATE ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 3/27/2019 to remove duplicate image; see entry #11) (ts).
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Townsend Corporation and Townsend Tree Service, LLC to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead to #1 Complaint to 04-20-2019 by The Townsend Corporation, Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC, Todd Holler, Patricia Holler (Kennedy, Gregory) (Modified on 3/27/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC (Kennedy, Gregory)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant The Townsend Corporation (Kennedy, Gregory)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory E. Kennedy, Landon S. Moyer on behalf of Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC, The Townsend Corporation. (Kennedy, Gregory) (Modified on 3/27/2019 to add party filer) (ts)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory E. Kennedy, Landon S. Moyer on behalf of The Townsend Corporation, Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC. (Kennedy, Gregory) (Modified on 3/27/2019 to add party filer)(ts).
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 2/26/2019 as to Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (slr) (Modified on 2/28/2019 to add link) (slr).
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 2/26/2019 as to The Townsend Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. (slr) (Modified on 2/28/2019 to add link) (slr).
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Amanda J. Davis updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Patricia Holler, Todd Holler. (McQueen, James)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Townsend Corporation, Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC) (btm)
February 21, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7082502. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Summons - The Townsend Corporation, #6 Proposed Summons - Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holler v. The Townsend Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Holler
Represented By: Aaron M. Kidd
Represented By: James D. McQueen, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda J. Davis
Represented By: Christopher J. Heavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Holler
Represented By: Aaron M. Kidd
Represented By: James D. McQueen, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda J. Davis
Represented By: Christopher J. Heavens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Townsend Corporation
Represented By: Gregory E. Kennedy
Represented By: Landon Scott Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Townsend Tree Company Service, LLC
Represented By: Gregory E. Kennedy
Represented By: Landon Scott Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?