Baxter v. Warden Young

Petitioner: Arthur Anthony Baxter
Respondent: Warden Young
Case Number: 5:2019cv00261
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the West Virginia Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 10, 2019 Case transferred to District of USDC for the Southern District of West Virginia. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/10/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer the case to the Clerk of the Court of the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 4/10/19. (Pro Se Petitioner via CM/rrr) (lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/10/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 2241 Forms) ( Pro Se Petitioner via US Mail) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/10/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Pro Se Petitioner via US Mail) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/10/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden Young, filed by Arthur Anthony Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(lmm) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 4/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter v. Warden Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur Anthony Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?