Trammell v. The Sylvanus Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles A. Trammell
Defendant: Sean Marshall, The Sylvanus Group, LLC, Robert Tapp, Aero-Smith, Inc. and George Smith
Case Number: 5:2019cv00419
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles A. Trammell for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Stroebel, Paul)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT (Affidavit) by Charles A. Trammell in support of #8 Response In Opposition. (Stroebel, Paul)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 is CANCELLED, and that this case proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 11/1/2019, and all depositions by 12/13/2019. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 9/3/2019, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 10/21/2019, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 11/12/2019. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 2/28/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 4/24/2020, with responses due by 5/1/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 5/15/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 5/22/2020. Proposed Voir Dire, Jury Instructions, and Verdict Form due by 5/22/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 6/3/2020 in Beckley. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 7/2/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Charles A. Trammell, Aero-Smith, Inc., Sean Marshall, Robert Tapp, The Sylvanus Group, LLC. (Stroebel, Paul) (Modified on 7/2/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 OPPOSITION by Aero-Smith, Inc., Sean Marshall, Robert Tapp, The Sylvanus Group, LLC to #6 MOTION by Charles A. Trammell to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Greenbrier County and for Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Hanna, Rachel) (Modified on 7/2/2019 to remove incorrect party filer) (ts).
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY by Sean Marshall, Robert Tapp to #8 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanna, Rachel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Charles A. Trammell in opposition to #4 MOTION by Sean Marshall, Robert Tapp, The Sylvanus Group, LLC to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Stroebel, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles A. Trammell in support of #6 MOTION by Charles A. Trammell to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Greenbrier County and for Fees and Expenses (Stroebel, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Charles A. Trammell to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Greenbrier County and for Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stroebel, Paul)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 Motion by Sean Marshall, Robert Tapp, The Sylvanus Group, LLC to Dismiss Complaint. ERROR: Memorandum of Law attached to motion. CORRECTION: Removed memorandum of law and refiled it as ECF No. 5. (ts)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM by Sean Marshall, Robert Tapp in support of #4 MOTION by Sean Marshall, Robert Tapp, The Sylvanus Group, LLC to Dismiss Complaint. (ts)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Sean Marshall, Robert Tapp, The Sylvanus Group, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #2 Certificate of Service)(Hanna, Rachel) (Modified on 6/10/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal, remove memorandum of law attached as exhibit and refile as ECF No. 5) (ts).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 6/19/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 6/24/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 7/1/2019. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM on 7/18/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 7/25/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 8/1/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 6/3/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
May 31, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Sylvanus Group, LLC. ERROR: State Court docket sheet omitted from original filing. CORRECTION: Added docket sheet. (slr).
May 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Sylvanus Group, LLC with summons and complaint from Circuit Court of Greenbrier County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7260092. (Attachments: #1 Exihibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service - Greenbrier Co. Circuit Clerk, #3 Certificate of Service - Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Civil Cover Sheet #5 State Court Docket Sheet) (slr). (Modified on 5/31/2019 to add state court docket sheet)(slr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trammell v. The Sylvanus Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Marshall
Represented By: Rachel Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sylvanus Group, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tapp
Represented By: Rachel Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aero-Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Trammell
Represented By: R. Brandon Johnson
Represented By: Paul M. Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?