Scott v. 360 Trucking LLC
Plaintiff: Samantha K. Scott
Defendant: Matt Strawhacker and 360 Trucking LLC
Interested Party: Government Employees Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00499
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by M. Andrew Brison and Brittany T. Harden updating name and/or firm information on behalf of 360 Trucking LLC, Matt Strawhacker. (Brison, M.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from J. David Stradley on behalf of Samantha K. Scott. Local counsel: William M. Tiano. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7363235. (Tiano, William)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 9/12/2019 is CANCELLED; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 11/29/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/30/2020, and all depositions by 6/25/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 1/17/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 2/17/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 3/4/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 7/23/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 8/21/2020, with responses due by 8/28/2020. Proposed Voir Dire, Jury Instructions, and Verdict Form due by 10/5/2020. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/7/2020. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 10/14/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference at 9:00 AM on 10/21/2020 in Beckley. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 9:00 AM in Beckley before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/26/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by 360 Trucking LLC, Matt Strawhacker.(Brison, M.) (Modified on 8/26/2019 to add jury demand) (ts).
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by 360 Trucking LLC, Matt Strawhacker, Government Employees Insurance Company, Samantha K. Scott. (Brison, M.) (Modified on 8/28/2019 to add party filers)(ts).
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for 360 Trucking LLC and Matt Strawhacker to File a Responsive Pleading to #1 Complaint to August 23, 2019 by 360 Trucking LLC, Matt Strawhacker, Samantha K. Scott (Brison, M.) (Modified on 8/20/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer)(ts).
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/21/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/22/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/29/2019. Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 9/12/2019 in Beckley. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/19/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/1/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by Government Employees Insurance Company.(Settles, Christopher) (Modified on 8/1/2019 to add jury demand)(ts).
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/11/2019 as to 360 Trucking LLC. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002548831. (btm)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/11/2019 as to Matt Strawhacker. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002548848. (btm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 360 Trucking LLC, Government Employees Insurance Company, Matt Strawhacker, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons-Strawhacker, #2 Summons-Government Employees Insurance) (msa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7310386. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct filed date) (msa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. 360 Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Strawhacker
Represented By: M. Andrew Brison
Represented By: Brittany T. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360 Trucking LLC
Represented By: M. Andrew Brison
Represented By: Brittany T. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Martin Settles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha K. Scott
Represented By: William M. Tiano
Represented By: Lacy Wright, Jr.
Represented By: J. David Stradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?