United States of America v. Real property situated at 433 4-H Lake Drive, Daniels, Raleigh County, West Virginia
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real property situated at 210 Parkwood Drive, Beckley, Raleigh County, West Virginia, Real property situated at 433 4-H Lake Drive, Daniels, Raleigh County, West Virginia and Real property situated at 219 N. Eisenhower Drive, Beckley, Raleigh County, West Virginia
Claimant: First Community Bank and Natalie Cochran
Case Number: 5:2019cv00537
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 CLAIM by Natalie Cochran's Against Property Subject to Forfeiture (Johnson, Rhett)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 VERIFIED CLAIM of Interest in the Real Property and Premises Situated at 433 4-H Lake Drive, Daniels, Raleigh County, West Virginia by Claimant First Community Bank (Boone, Floyd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rhett H. Johnson on behalf of Natalie Cochran. (Johnson, Rhett)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing by Natalie Cochran, pro se. (slr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America of Complaint of Forfeiture Against Real Property re: #1 Complaint for Forfeiture. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service)(Robeson, Kathleen)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that Wesley Page, FPD, be appointed to represent Natalie Cochran in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/30/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party; Wesley Page; Natalie Cochran) (msa)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT. (slr)
July 23, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn: #3 MOTION by United States of America to Seal Ex Parte Motion for Post-Complaint Protective Order. (ts)
July 23, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by United States of America to Seal Ex Parte Motion for Post-Complaint Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Motion, #2 Proposed Protective Order, #3 Proposed Order to Seal)(Robeson, Kathleen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE by United States of America against Real property situated at 210 Parkwood Drive, Beckley, Raleigh County, West Virginia, Real property situated at 219 N. Eisenhower Drive, Beckley, Raleigh County, West Virginia, Real property situated at 433 4-H Lake Drive, Daniels, Raleigh County, West Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real property situated at 433 4-H Lake Drive, Daniels, Raleigh County, West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property situated at 210 Parkwood Drive, Beckley, Raleigh County, West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property situated at 433 4-H Lake Drive, Daniels, Raleigh County, West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real property situated at 219 N. Eisenhower Drive, Beckley, Raleigh County, West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kathleen Robeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: First Community Bank
Represented By: Floyd E. Boone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Natalie Cochran
Represented By: Rhett H. Johnson
Represented By: Wesley P. Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?