Skeens v. Stanley
Plaintiff: William P Skeens
Defendant: Officer Stanley
Case Number: 5:2019cv00628
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order and #6 Judgment Order to attorneys, any unrepresented party and Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (Attachments: #1 Judgment Order) (btm)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT ORDER directing that this case be DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the docket of this Court in accordance with the #5 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/1/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that the Court ADOPTS the #4 Proposed Findings and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge, the Plaintiff's #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs be DENIED, the Plaintiff's #2 Complaint be DISMISSED, and this matter be REMOVED from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 10/1/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party; Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn) (btm)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION: RECOMMENDING that the District Court DENY Plaintiff's #1 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, DISMISS Plaintiff's #2 Complaint, and remove this matter from the Court's docket. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. Objections to Proposed F&R due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 9/9/2019. (cc: Plaintiff - pro se) (btm)
August 30, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Continuation, #2 Envelope) (btm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by William P Skeens to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skeens v. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P Skeens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?