Jones v. Greenbrier Minerals, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Jones
Defendant: Greenbrier Minerals, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00814
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher M. Jones for First Set of Discovery to Greenbrier Minerals, LLC. (Walters, Richard)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greenbrier Minerals, LLC for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. (Haught Parsons, Kelsey)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: CANCELLING the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 1/13/2020; directing that this case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 1/29/2020. The parties shall serve all discovery requests by 6/15/2020, and complete all depositions by 7/28/2020. Expert Witness List by the party bearing the burden of proof due no later than 4/29/2020, by the party not bearing the burden of proof due no later than 5/29/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due no later than 6/14/2020. All dispositive motions, except those filed under Rule 12(b), shall be filed and served by 8/17/2020, with responses due by 8/31/2020, and replies due by 9/8/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held no later than 10/19/2020. All motions in limine shall be filed and served by 10/26/2020, with responses due by 11/2/2020. The plaintiff portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 10/22/2020, and the proposed integrated pretrial order due for entry no later than 10/29/2020. A pretrial conference shall be held at 10:30 AM on 11/2/2020, in Beckley. Proposed charges to the jury due by 12/1/2020. A final settlement conference shall be held at 1:30 PM on 12/7/2020. Trial of this action shall be held at 9:00 AM on 12/8/2020, before Judge Frank W. Volk. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 1/7/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Greenbrier Minerals, LLC, Christopher M. Jones. (Moore, Brian) (Modified on 1/6/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Greenbrier Minerals, LLC (Moore, Brian)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greenbrier Minerals, LLC.(Moore, Brian) (Modified on 11/26/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: The following dates are hereby fixed as the time by or on which certain events must occur: 12/16/2019 - Rule 12(b) Motions. 12/30/2019 - Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting. 1/6/2020 - Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. 1/13/2020 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 1:30 PM before Judge Frank W. Volk. 1/17/2020 - Entry of Scheduling Order. 1/27/2020 - Last day to serve Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 11/20/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
November 14, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greenbrier Minerals, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7460564. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Greenbrier Minerals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher M. Jones
Represented By: Richard W. Walters
Represented By: Carl W. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Minerals, LLC
Represented By: Anna M. Dailey
Represented By: Brian J. Moore
Represented By: Kelsey Haught Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?