The Charleston Building and Construction Trades Council et al v. Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Charleston Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO and The West Virginia State Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Defendant: Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC and Invenergy, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00827
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Invenergy, LLC to Join in Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC's Motion Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (Carr, Kevin)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY by Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC to #11 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Carr, Kevin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charleston Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, West Virginia State Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO amending the complaint attached to #1 Notice of Removal, against Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC, Invenergy, LLC. (msa)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME to Reply to #10 Response In Opposition, #11 Response In Opposition to January 6, 2020 by Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC, Invenergy, LLC, The Charleston Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, The West Virginia State Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, Invenergy, LLC (Thompson, Chelsea) (Modified on 12/24/2019 to add party filers)(ts).
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Charleston Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO in opposition to #8 MOTION by Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Proceedings (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Trivelli, Vincent) (Modified on 12/20/2019 to remove link to #9 memorandum) (ts).
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Charleston Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO in opposition to #6 MOTION by Invenergy, LLC to Dismiss Complaint (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Trivelli, Vincent) (Modified on 12/20/2019 to remove link to #7 memorandum) (ts).
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC in support of #8 MOTION by Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Thompson, Chelsea)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC to Compel Arbitration and to Stay the Proceedings (Thompson, Chelsea)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Invenergy, LLC in support of #6 MOTION by Invenergy, LLC to Dismiss Complaint (Thompson, Chelsea)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Invenergy, LLC to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Thompson, Chelsea) (Modified on 12/9/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: The following dates are hereby fixed as the time by or on which certain events must occur: 12/30/2019 - Rule 12(b) Motions. 1/13/2020 - Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting. 1/20/2020 - Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. 1/27/2020 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:30 PM before Judge Frank W. Volk. 1/31/2020 - Entry of Scheduling Order. 2/10/2020 - Last day to serve Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 12/4/2019. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that the Court GRANTS Defendants' #3 MOTION to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading; that the Defendants' must file a responsive pleading by 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 12/4/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC, Invenergy, LLC to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal to 12/05/2019 (Thompson, Chelsea) (Modified on 12/3/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
November 21, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Invenergy, LLC and Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Greenbrier County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7468031. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Charleston Building and Construction Trades Council et al v. Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charleston Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Vincent Trivelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The West Virginia State Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Vincent Trivelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beech Ridge Energy, II, LLC
Represented By: Kevin L. Carr
Represented By: Megan Whitney Mullins
Represented By: Chelsea Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invenergy, LLC
Represented By: Kevin L. Carr
Represented By: Megan Whitney Mullins
Represented By: Chelsea Elizabeth Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?