Paynter et al v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Dakota William Paynter and Benjamin Thomas Paynter
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00888
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: The following dates are hereby fixed as the time by or on which certain events must occur: 2/10/2020 - Rule 12(b) Motions. 2/24/2020 - Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting. 3/2/2020 - Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. 3/9/2020 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 4:30 PM before Judge Frank W. Volk. 3/16/2020 - Entry of Scheduling Order. 3/23/2020 - Last day to serve Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 1/15/2020. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
January 15, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Benjamin Thomas Paynter, Dakota William Paynter in support of #8 Response In Opposition (Davis, Christopher) (Modified on 1/15/2020 to add party filer)(ts).
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Benjamin Thomas Paynter, Dakota William Paynter in opposition to #7 Reply to Response (Davis, Christopher) (Modified on 1/15/2020 to add party filer)(ts).
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY MEMORANDUM by General Motors LLC to #5 Response In Opposition,, #6 Memorandum In Opposition. (Bird, Melissa) (Modified on 1/7/2020 to remove links to #3 motion and #4 memorandum in support) (ts).
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Dakota William Paynter in opposition to #3 MOTION by General Motors LLC to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Christopher)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Dakota William Paynter in opposition to #3 MOTION by General Motors LLC to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Davis, Christopher)
December 16, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Motors LLC with summons, complaint, amended complaint, docket sheet, and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. ERROR: Exhibit A PDF was faulty and contained two blank pages. CORRECTION: Removed blank pages; removed and replaced image. (slr)
December 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by General Motors LLC in support of #3 MOTION by General Motors LLC to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Bird, Melissa)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by General Motors LLC to Dismiss Amended Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Bird, Melissa) (Modified on 12/17/2019 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Motors LLC with summons, complaint, amended complaint, docket sheet, and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7485590. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (slr) (Modified on 12/16/2019 to remove and replace image of Exhibit A)(slr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paynter et al v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota William Paynter
Represented By: Christopher M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Thomas Paynter
Represented By: Christopher M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Represented By: Michael Drury Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?