Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company v. Elwood et al
Plaintiff: Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: John K. Elwood, Rachel Kesner, Betty Elwood, Laura Ann Dinert, Nancy Sue Elwood, Ruth Eugenia Whitner, Deborah Grace Elliot-Smith, J. K., John Kevin Elwood, Stephen Lee DiBlasi, Tyrone N. Sea, Andromeda K. Kesner, Jack Elwood and Edward J. Sea
Case Number: 5:2019cv00892
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: The following dates are hereby fixed as the time by or on which certain events must occur: 2/10/2020 - Rule 12(b) Motions. 2/24/2020 - Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting. 3/2/2020 - Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. 3/16/2020 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM before Judge Frank W. Volk. 3/23/2020 - Entry of Scheduling Order. 3/30/2020 - Last day to serve Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 1/15/2020. (cc:attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT B by Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company in support of #1 Complaint. (Wyant, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by J. K., Andromeda K. Kesner, Rachel Kesner, Edward J. Sea, Tyrone N. Sea.(Burnette, W.)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by W. Mark Burnette on behalf of J. K., Andromeda K. Kesner, Rachel Kesner, Edward J. Sea, Edward J. Sea, Edward J. Sea, Tyrone N. Sea. (Burnette, W.)
December 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John K. Elwood, Betty Elwood, John Kevin Elwood, Stephen Lee DiBlasi, Deborah Grace Elliot-Smith, Ruth Eugenia Whitner, Laura Ann Dinert, Nancy Sue Elwood, Edward J. Sea(Personal Representative of Tyrone N. Sea and Administrator of his Estate), Edward J. Sea(Personal Representative of Andromeda K. Kesner and Administrator of her Estate), Edward J. Sea, and Rachel Kesner re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Betty Elwood, #2 Summons - John Kevin Elwood, #3 Summons - Stephen Lee DiBlasi, #4 Summons - Deborah Grace Elliot-Smith, #5 Summons - Ruth Eugenia Whitner, #6 Summons - Laura Ann Dinert, #7 Summons - Nancy Sue Elwood, #8 Summons - Edward J. Sea personal representative of Tyrone N. Sea, #9 Summons - Edward J. Sea Personal Representative of Andromeda K. Kesner, #10 Summons - Edward J. Sea individually, #11 Summons - Edward J. Sea guardian of J.K., #12 Summons - Rachel Kesner individually, #13 Summons - Rachel Kesner guardian of J.K.) (btm)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7486337. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A continued, #3 Exhibit A continued, #4 Exhibit A continued, #5 Exhibit A continued, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit B continued, #8 Exhibit B continued, #9 Exhibit B continued, #10 Exhibit B continued, #11 Proposed Summons - John K. Elwood, #12 Proposed Summons - Betty Elwood, #13 Proposed Summons - John Kevin Elwood, #14 Proposed Summons - Stephen Lee DiBlasi, #15 Proposed Summons - Deborah Grace Elliot-Smith, #16 Proposed Summons - Ruth Eugenia Whitner, #17 Proposed Summons - Laura Ann Dinert, #18 Proposed Summons - Nancy Sue Elwood, #19 Proposed Summons - Edward J. Sea, #20 Proposed Summons - Edward J. Sea, #21 Proposed Summons - Edward J. Sea, #22 Proposed Summons - Edward J. Sea, #23 Proposed Summons - Rachel Kesner, #24 Proposed Summons - Rachel Kesner, #25 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm) (Additional Exhibit B filed at ECF #6) (ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company v. Elwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John K. Elwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Kesner
Represented By: W. Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Elwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Ann Dinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Sue Elwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Eugenia Whitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Grace Elliot-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. K.
Represented By: W. Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kevin Elwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Lee DiBlasi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyrone N. Sea
Represented By: W. Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andromeda K. Kesner
Represented By: W. Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Elwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward J. Sea
Represented By: W. Mark Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Family Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David L. Wyant
Represented By: Jason P. Pockl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?