Brown v. Equitrans Midstream Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brad Brown
Defendant: Equitrans Midstream Corporation and EQM Midstream Partners, LP
Case Number: 5:2020cv00434
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 RESET ANSWER DEADLINE as to EQM Midstream Partners, LP and Equitrans Midstream Corporation for 8/28/2020. (mk)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED STIPULATION for Equitrans Midstream Corporation and EQM Midstream Partners, LP to respond to #1 Complaint to 8/28/2020 by EQM Midstream Partners, LP, Equitrans Midstream Corporation, Brad Brown (Hicks, Jennifer) (Modified on 8/4/2020 to add link to #1 Complaint and to add party filer) (mk).
July 31, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #11 Statement of Visiting Attorney from Katelyn M. Matscherz on behalf of Equitrans Midstream Corporation, EQM Midstream Partners, LP. Local counsel: Jennifer J. Hicks. ERROR: Document did not contain attorney signature. CORRECTION: Image replaced. (mk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Christian Antkowiak on behalf of Equitrans Midstream Corporation, EQM Midstream Partners, LP. Local counsel: Jennifer J. Hicks. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7691568. (Hicks, Jennifer)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Katelyn M. Matscherz on behalf of Equitrans Midstream Corporation, EQM Midstream Partners, LP. Local counsel: Jennifer J. Hicks. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7691558. (Hicks, Jennifer) (Modified on 7/31/2020 to replace incorrect image; document did not contain attorney signature) (mk).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: The following dates are hereby fixed as the time by or on which certain events must occur: 8/28/2020 - Rule 12(b) Motions. 9/22/2020 - Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting. 9/29/2020 - Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. 10/19/2020 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM before Judge Frank W. Volk. 10/23/2020 - Entry of Scheduling Order. 10/27/2020 - Last day to serve Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 7/29/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (slr)
July 27, 2020 SET ANSWER DEADLINE as to EQM Midstream Partners, LP 8/13/2020 and Equitrans Midstream Corporation for 8/13/2020 pursuant #9 Stipulation. (mk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Equitrans Midstream Corporation and EQM Midstream Partners, LP to respond to #1 Complaint to August 13, 2020 by EQM Midstream Partners, LP, Equitrans Midstream Corporation, Brad Brown (Hicks, Jennifer) (Modified on 7/28/2020 to add link to #1 Complaint and to add party filer) (mk).
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Jo Hicks, Mychal S. Schulz, Timothy M. Miller on behalf of EQM Midstream Partners, LP, Equitrans Midstream Corporation. (Hicks, Jennifer)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Taylor A. Jones on behalf of Brad Brown. Local counsel: Anthony J Majestro. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7684150. (Majestro, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Michael A Josephson on behalf of Brad Brown. Local counsel: Anthony J Majestro. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7684144. (Majestro, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Brad Brown. Local counsel: Anthony J Majestro. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7684143. (Majestro, Anthony)
June 25, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (btm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equitrans Midstream Corporation, EQM Midstream Partners, LP, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons - EQM Midstream Partners LP) (btm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICES OF CONSENT by Brad Brown (Attachments: #1 Consent - Appling, #2 Consent - Dodd)(Majestro, Anthony)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7656009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Summons - Equitrans Midstream Corporation, #3 Proposed Summons - EQM Midstream Partners LP, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Equitrans Midstream Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitrans Midstream Corporation
Represented By: Katelyn M. Matscherz
Represented By: Jennifer Jo Hicks
Represented By: Christian C. Antkowiak
Represented By: Timothy M. Miller
Represented By: Mychal Sommer Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQM Midstream Partners, LP
Represented By: Katelyn M. Matscherz
Represented By: Jennifer Jo Hicks
Represented By: Christian C. Antkowiak
Represented By: Timothy M. Miller
Represented By: Mychal Sommer Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Brown
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: James S. Nelson
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Taylor Ashley Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?