Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International v. Greenbrier Hotel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International
Defendant: Greenbrier Hotel Corporation, Oakhurst Club LLC, Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc., Old White Charities, Inc. and Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00520
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 CASES ASSOCIATED: Create association to 5:19-cv-00772. (slr)
September 18, 2020 THIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH 5:19-cv-00772 AS OF 9/18/2020. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED IN 5:19-cv-00772. (slr)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Granting the #33 MOTION by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International to consolidate cases 5:20-cv-00520 and 5:19-cv-00772 and to Reform the Pleadings; directing that Civil Action No. 5:20-cv-00520 be consolidated with Civil Action No. 5:19-cv-00772, which shall be designated as the lead case; directing that GGG be recognized as the Defendant in the consolidated action with its claims against the Greenbrier Entities construed as counterclaims in the consolidated action. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (slr)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AND NOTICE granting the Plaintiff's #35 Motion to Modify and extending the deadlines as follows: Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/30/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/7/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 10/14/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/21/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/28/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/16/2020. (cc:counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International to Modify Dates Set by Court for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, Report of Planning Meeting, and Scheduling Conference re: #29 Judge Johnston's Order and Notice (Villers, Morgan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International in support of #33 MOTION by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International to consolidate cases 5:20-cv-00520 and 5:19-cv-00772 and Reform the Pleadings (Villers, Morgan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION by Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International to consolidate cases 5:20-cv-00520 and 5:19-cv-00772 and Reform the Pleadings (Villers, Morgan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Morgan Villers on behalf of Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (Villers, Morgan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Peter DeMasters on behalf of Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International. (DeMasters, Peter)
August 12, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Peter DeMasters on behalf of Greenbrier Hotel Corporation. (DeMasters, Peter)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/24/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/8/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/14/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM on 9/22/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/25/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/6/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/6/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 28 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
July 31, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
July 31, 2020 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02812. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 31, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred to the USDC for the Southern District of West Virginia, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/21/20. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part with the consent of the parties Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer, Dkt. #15 , and transferring case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/21/2020. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT by GOODMAN-GABLE-GOULD/ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL (Marcus, Bruce) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's motion requesting that Richard A. Getty be permitted to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. #23 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Richard A. Getty is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/20/2020. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2020 re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION. Oral motion by Defendants for Attorney Richard Getty to appear today; HEARD and GRANTED, Attorney Getty granted special leave of Court to provisionally appear for today's matter pending his Pro Hace Vice Motion, which shall be filed no later than close of business on 7/21/2020. For the reasons stated on the record, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 12 noon on 7/23/2020. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard Alan Getty, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7361930. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Pollack, Barry) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Dkt. #14 , Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, motion to transfer, Dkt. #15 , and the subsequent briefing, the Court concludes that oral argument would be beneficial to deciding the pending motion. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear telephonically for oral argument on July 20, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/7/2020. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Response by GOODMAN-GABLE-GOULD/ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL re #16 Response to motion (Attachments: #1 Corrected Filing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Bruce) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Memorandum of Points and Authorities by GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Corrected Memorandum Of, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Pollack, Barry) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 20 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC. (Pollack, Barry) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the terms of the Court's revised standing order, which is available on the Court's website. # Click for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/23/20. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE (Notice of Filing Order from Related Action Pending in the Southern District of West Virginia) by GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pollack, Barry) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pollack, Barry) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. #17 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall file their reply brief on or before December 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/2/19. (lcrdm1) Modified on 12/2/2019 (kt). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
November 28, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case by GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Barry) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #15 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case filed by GOODMAN-GABLE-GOULD/ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Bruce) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Transfer Case by GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Pollack, Barry) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's filing of its amended complaint, Dkt. #14 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to stay, Dkt. #13 , is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/22/19. (lcrdm1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by GOODMAN-GABLE-GOULD/ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Redline Comparison)(Marcus, Bruce) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, to Stay) by GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Pollack, Barry). Added MOTION to Stay on 10/9/2019 (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry J. Pollack on behalf of All Defendants (Pollack, Barry) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/9/2019) (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OAKHURST CLUB, LLC served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Marcus, Bruce) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/1/2019) (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Marcus, Bruce) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/1/2019) (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Marcus, Bruce) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/1/2019) (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Marcus, Bruce) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/1/2019) (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Marcus, Bruce) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/1/2019) (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/20/19. (lcrdm1, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to GREENBRIER HOTEL CORPORATION, GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, INC., GREENBRIER SPORTING CLUB, INC., OAKHURST CLUB, LLC, OLD WHITE CHARITIES, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zeg) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Lawrence Marcus on behalf of GOODMAN-GABLE-GOULD/ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL (Marcus, Bruce) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOODMAN-GABLE-GOULD/ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL (Bonsib, Robert) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by GOODMAN-GABLE-GOULD/ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL. Case related to Case No. 3:19-cv-00623. (Bonsib, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/20/2019) (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6385446) filed by GOODMAN-GABLE-GOULD/ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Bonsib, Robert) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/20/2019) (zeg). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 7/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International v. Greenbrier Hotel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Hotel Corporation
Represented By: Barry J. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakhurst Club LLC
Represented By: Barry J. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Sporting Club Development Company, Inc.
Represented By: Barry J. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old White Charities, Inc.
Represented By: Barry J. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Sporting Club, Inc.
Represented By: Barry J. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodman-Gable-Gould/Adjusters International
Represented By: Robert Charles Bonsib
Represented By: Bruce Lawrence Marcus
Represented By: Peter DeMasters
Represented By: Morgan Villers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?