O'Dell v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Roger Dean O'Dell
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv00266
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-269) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of California transferring this action to the USDC/NDCA for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 5/17/2021. (cc: attys) (kew)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-269), MDL 2741. (kew)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that this case is stayed pending remand; the parties are to inform the Court within 15 days of remand. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 5/10/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)
April 26, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Monsanto Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (btm)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7931908. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Dell v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Dean O'Dell
Represented By: John David Hurst
Represented By: Charles Edward Amos, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?