Rust et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Rust and B. C. C.
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Noramco, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States and West Virginia Board of Pharmacy
Case Number: 5:2021cv00449
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #7 JOINT MOTION for an Immediate Stay of All Further Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer of this Action to Multi District Litigation. This case is stayed and RETIRED to the inactive docket pending the MDL decision on a conditional transfer order. In the event the MDL panel decides not to file a conditional transfer order in the case, the parties are DIRECTED to inform the Court of such within 15 days of the MDL panel decision. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 8/23/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for West Virginia Board of Pharmacy to respond to Complaint by West Virginia Board of Pharmacy, Nancy Rust, B. C. C. (Taylor, Justin) (Modified on 8/19/2021 to add party filers) (mk).
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Johnson & Johnson and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to respond to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Nancy Rust, B. C. C. (Williams, Marc) (Modified on 8/17/2021 to add party filers) (mk).
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION by Johnson & Johnson, McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for an Immediate Stay of All Further Proceedings and Deadlines Pending Transfer of this Action to Multi District Litigation re: #1 Notice of Removal (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(George, Keith) (Modified on 8/16/2021 to add party filer) (mk).
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH MCKINSEY MAY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Nancy Rust, B.C.C., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States; said parties stipulate that the time within which McKinsey may move, answer or defend in any manner to the Complaint is extended to and including thirty (30) days after the later of (i) this Courts decision on any remand motion or (ii) the date that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") sustains any valid objection to transfer of the claims against McKinsey in this Action to In re: McKinsey & Company, Inc. National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation, MDL No. 2996, pending in the United States District Court for the Northern District of California (the "McKinsey MDL"). (George, Keith) (Modified on 8/13/2021 to add party filers)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States (George, Keith)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Williams, Marc)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Notice of Removal. (Williams, Marc)
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States with complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Greenbrier County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8008893. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rust et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Rust
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: W. Jesse Forbes
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. C. C.
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: W. Jesse Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Chesney Frampton
Represented By: Marc E. Williams
Represented By: Robert L. Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco
Represented By: Jon B. Orndorff
Represented By: Kelly Calder Mowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Represented By: David S. Russo
Represented By: John C. Palmer, IV
Represented By: Keith J. George
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Board of Pharmacy
Represented By: Justin C. Taylor
Represented By: Michael W. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?