Holland et al v. Bluestone Coal Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael H. Holland, Michael O. McKown, Paul Piccolini, Carlo Tarley and United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan
Defendant: Bluestone Coal Corporation, Bluestone Industries Inc. and Keystone Service Industries Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00472
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1002
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 10/27/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 11/22/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 11/29/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 03:00 PM on 12/13/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 12/23/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 12/27/2021. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 9/27/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (msa)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Bluestone Coal Corporation, Bluestone Industries Inc., Keystone Service Industries Inc.(Hatfield, Ronald)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/1/2021 as to Keystone Service Industries Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003165617. (msa)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/1/2021 as to Bluestone Coal Corporation. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003165600. (msa)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 9/1/2021 as to Bluestone Industries Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003165594. (msa)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Larry D. Newsome on behalf of United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan, Michael H. Holland, Michael O. McKown, Carlo Tarley, Paul Piccolini. Local counsel: James Woodrow Hill. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8023443. (Hill, James)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Glenda Finch on behalf of United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan, Michael H. Holland, Michael O. McKown, Carlo Tarley, Paul Piccolini. Local counsel: James Woodrow Hill. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8023436. (Hill, James)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Clayton Creswell on behalf of United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan, Michael H. Holland, Michael O. McKown, Carlo Tarley, Paul Piccolini. Local counsel: James Woodrow Hill. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8023423. (Hill, James)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bluestone Coal Corporation, Bluestone Industries Inc., Keystone Service Industries Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Bluestone Industries Inc., #2 Summons - Keystone Service Industries Inc.) (btm)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8013710. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons - Bluestone Coal Corporation, #2 Proposed Summons - Bluestone Industries, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons - Keystone Service Industries, Inc., #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)
August 18, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland et al v. Bluestone Coal Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael H. Holland
Represented By: Clayton M. Creswell
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael O. McKown
Represented By: Clayton M. Creswell
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Piccolini
Represented By: Clayton M. Creswell
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlo Tarley
Represented By: Clayton M. Creswell
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan
Represented By: Clayton M. Creswell
Represented By: Glenda S. Finch
Represented By: James Woodrow Hill
Represented By: Larry D. Newsome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluestone Coal Corporation
Represented By: Ronald H. Hatfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluestone Industries Inc.
Represented By: Ronald H. Hatfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Service Industries Inc.
Represented By: Ronald H. Hatfield, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?