Monroe v. Monroe
Plaintiff: Jennifer R. Monroe
Defendant: James E. Monroe, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00044
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Bankruptcy hearing as to James Eugene Monroe Jr. (msa)
March 7, 2022 Filing 5 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT, SEALED, NOTICE of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as to James Eugene Monroe Jr. (msa)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case as to James Eugene Monroe Jr. (msa)
January 25, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
January 24, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James E. Monroe, Jr, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mfo) (Modified on 1/25/2022 to update date filed) (ts).
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8118013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to James E. Monroe, Jr., #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfo) (Modified on 1/25/2022 to update date filed) (ts).
January 24, 2022 CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer R. Monroe
Represented By: John F. Hussell, IV
Represented By: R. Brandon Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Monroe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?