Davis v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Davis
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation and doing business as PHH Mortgage Service and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv00422
Filed: August 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frank W Volk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2024 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corporation (Jacobs, Bruce)
August 22, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Jacobs, Bruce)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 9/18/2024. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 10/15/2024. Last day to file Report of Parties Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 10/21/2024. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 4:00 PM on 11/4/2024, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 11/14/2024. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 11/18/2024. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 8/19/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca)
August 15, 2024 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Brandon J. Davis (Smith, Gary)
August 15, 2024 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Patterson, Matthew)
August 15, 2024 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (btm)
August 15, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (btm)
August 15, 2024 Filing 2 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Patterson, Matthew) (Modified on 8/15/2024 to update ECF No.)(ts).
August 14, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Raleigh County. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8711493. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - PHH Mortgage Corporation's Consent to Removal, #3 State Court Summons and Return, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm) (Modified on 8/15/2024 to update ECF numbering) (ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Davis
Represented By: Sarah K. Brown
Represented By: Gary M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation and doing business as PHH Mortgage Service
Represented By: Nicholas P. Mooney, II
Represented By: Bruce M. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?