Guardian Pipeline LLC v. 295.49 acres of land et al
Plaintiff: Guardian Pipeline LLC
Defendant: 295.49 acres of land, Ambrosius Development LLC and Unknown
Case Number: 1:2008cv00028
Filed: January 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717 Natural Gas Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 615 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on November 26, 2010. Richesons' Motion to Revise is GRANTED insofar as the $28,792.32 award shall now include 5% interest per annum, beginning on the January 9, 2008 date of taking. In all other respects the motion is DENIED. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 582 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on August 24, 2010. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that Jack and Linda Richesons' 526 request that this Court adopt the Condemnation Commission is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Guardian pay $28,796.32 to Jack and Linda Richeson, in compensation for Guardian's partial taking of a permanent easement. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 565 DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT OF COMMISSION FOR VIOLA T. FAMILY, L.L.C. and GRANTING 536 Motion, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 07/22/2010. The Commissions award in the amount of $3,836 is confirmed, together with interest at the legal rate of 5% per annum from January 9, 2008, the date of the taking. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 491 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on November 20, 2009. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that Guardian's 490 motion is granted in part and denied in part as moot. The Condemnation Commission shall conduct a hearing regarding the W eninger property at 9:00 a.m. on February 15, 2010, in the County Board Room of the Calumet County Courthouse, located at 206 Court Street in Chilton, Wisconsin. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant Robert Weninger, appearing pro se, inten ds to provide the Condemnation Commission with an appraisal in support of his case, he shall serve that appraisal on the Plaintiff Guardian's attorney on or before Friday, January 29, 2010. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that a hearing for Defendant Holsum Dairy, Inc. shall be scheduled at a date and location to be determined by the Commission. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER denying 464 Motion in Limine, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10-14-2009. See Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 9/23/2009. (cc: all counsel via ECF; Commissioner Dietz, Commissioner Bayorgeon and Commissioner Nettesheim via e-mail; Commissioner Greenwood via U.S. Mail)(Griesbach, William)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardian Pipeline LLC v. 295.49 acres of land et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardian Pipeline LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 295.49 acres of land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ambrosius Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?