Non Typical Inc et al v. Transglobal Logistics Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Non Typical Inc
Defendant: Transglobal Logistics Group Inc. and Schneider Logistics International, Inc.
Involuntary_plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2010cv01058
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 90 Motion for PARTIAL Judgment on the Pleadings, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 05/24/2012. The negligence claims against Schneider are preempted by the FAAA. The negligence claims are alternatively dismissed for failing to state a claim under Wisconsin law. See Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SECOND AMENDED ORDER FOR JUDGMENT re 52 Letter, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 08/04/2011. Judgment in the amount of $1,075,610.00 shall be entered as follows: A. Against Defendant, Transglobal Logistics Group, Inc. and in favor of No n-Typical, Inc. in the amount of $325,610.00; B. Against Defendant Transglobal Logistics Group, Inc. and in favor of Hanover Insurance Company in the amount of $600,000.00; C. Against Defendant Transglobal Logistics Group, Inc. and in favor of Citizens Insurance Company in the amount of $150,000.00. This Order for Judgment shall supersede all previous orders. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED ORDER for Judgment in Favor of Hanover Insurance Company against Transglobal Logistics in the amount of $600,000. Also in favor of Citizens Insurance Company of America against Transglobal in the amount of $150,000.00.Signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/26/2011. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER FOR JUDGMENT - granting 46 Motion for Default Judgment. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Hanover Insurance Company and against Transglobal Logistics in the amount of $600,000. Upon default, judgment shall be entered in favor of Citizens Insurance Company of America against Transglobal in the amount of $150,000. Signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/25/2011. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 5/10/2011. Non Typical's claims for promissory estoppel and breach of the implied obligation of good faith and fair dealing are dismissed. Schneider's motion to dismiss the negligence and breach of contract claims is denied. The clerk is directed to schedule this matter for a scheduling conference. See Order for full details. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Consolidate Cases; signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 3/10/2011 (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Non Typical Inc et al v. Transglobal Logistics Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Non Typical Inc
Represented By: Chad R Levanetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Involuntary_plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transglobal Logistics Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Logistics International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?