Jurado Jimenez et al v. GLK Foods LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro Jurado Jimenez, Edgar Nieto Chavez, Jesus Jurado Ramirez, Jose Francisco Yerena Gonzalez, Jose Jimenez Jurado, Oswaldo Zuniga Medina, Abel Landin Garcia, Abraham Ruiz Mendoza, Alejandro Ponce Gonzalez, Antonio Jurado Jurado, Asael Quintana Ramirez, Carlos Jurado Rangel, Cristobal Martinez Velez, David Nieto Jimenez, Diego Armando Arroyo Garcia, Eduardo Robles Medina, Enrique Rosas Jurado, Fernando Rosas Rivera, Francisco Javier Nunez Perez, Jaime Jurado Ortiz, Javier Arroyo Ortiz, J Jesus Jimenez Rosas, J Jesus Ortiz Martinez, J Jesus Robles Medina, J Salud Rodriguez Ramirez, J Saul Jimenez Rosas, Jesus Eduardo Santiago Garcia, Jesus Martinez Gallardo, Jesus Ortiz Arriaga, Jesus Sifuentes Guerrero, Jorge Dimas Jimenez, Jose Alberto Garcia Camargo, Jose Alberto Martinez Gonzalez, Jose Antonio Flores Perez, Jose Antonio Ponce Gonzalez, Jose Baca Guevara, Jose David Flores Mendoza, Jose Javier Chavez Rangel, Jose Jurado Jurado, Jose Manuel Lopez Valencia, Jose Lorenzo Esparza Barron, Jose Manuel Ortega Paredes, Jose Mendez Baca, Jose Ramon Martinez Palmas, Jose Roberto Martinez Moreno, Juan Almanza Sanchez, Juan Godinez Lopez, Julio Cesar Cabrera Guerrero, Lucio Loredo Hernandez, Luis Andres Munoz Espinosa, Mario Rivas Quintana, Martin Chavez Jimenez, Miguel Ortiz Martinez, Nazario Rodriguez Guzman, Pedro Tapia Rodriguez, Rafael Arroyo Lopez, Rafael Jurado Rosas, Raul Ramirez Lancon, Roman Rodriguez Ramirez, Rosendo Aguilar Cardenas, Ruben Nieto Jimenez, Salvador Baca Jurado, Dario Flores Flores, Elias Ortiz Ramirez, Francisco Javier Jurado Chavez, Jesus Ricardo Arroyo Martinez, Marcelino Sifuentes Guerrero, Ramiro Martinez Santos, Raul Flores Flores, Alfredo Baca Lopez, Francisco Ruiz Figueroa, Jose Jiminez Quintana, Ruben Lancon Baca, Jose Juan Valadez Campos, Raul Omar Silva Razo, Jose Jurado Luva, Antonio Ramirez Jimenez, Manuel Mendoza Chiquito, J Jesus Romero Chavez, Juan Antonio Arroyo Jimenez and Miguel Lancon Delgado
Defendant: GLK Foods LLC and Ryan A Downs
Case Number: 1:2012cv00209
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Green Bay Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order EXHIBITS for All Parties destroyed. No response to notification received. (cav)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTIFICATION of Exhibit Release sent to counsel of record. (cav)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 USCA Mandate (certified copy) as to (198 in 1:12-cv-00209-WCG) Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC, (130 in 1:12-cv-00210-WCG) Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC USCA Number 17-3248, 17-3249 and 18-2227. The consolidated appeal is DISMISSED. (Attachments: #1 Final Order)(cav)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #260 Joint MOTION to authorize certain late claims for settlement payments by All Plaintiffs, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 04/29/2019. The parties, CDM, and Simpluris may process and pay valid late claims that are submitted to CDM within fourteen days of the date of this order. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Joint MOTION to Authorize Certain Late Claims for Settlement Payments by All Plaintiffs. (Lederer, Caryn)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Lederer, Caryn)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice regarding Plaintiffs' Final Supplemental Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Lederer, Caryn)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #256 Joint Stipulation seeking extension to supplemental fees briefing schedule, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/21/2019. Plaintiffs' supplemental fee petition is due on or before April 5, 2019 and defendants' response is due on or before April 26, 2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 STIPULATION to Extend Supplemental Fees Briefing By All Parties by All Defendants. (Kruzel, Steven)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #254 Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Final Supplemental Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by All Plaintiffs, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 02/27/2019. Plaintiffs' supplemental fee petition is due on or before March 22, 2019 and Defendants' response is due on or before April 12, 2019. Plaintiffs will not file a reply absent leave of the court. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Final Supplemental Petition for Attorney's Fees and Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Lederer, Caryn)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 CORRECTED ORDER EXONERATING APPEAL BONDS signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/20/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 LETTER from Steven Kruzel . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruzel, Steven)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Exonerating Appeal Bonds signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/17/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #250 Stipulation filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC ; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Seeking Order Exonerating Appeal Bonds by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kruzel, Steven)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 NOTICE of Appearance by Caryn C Lederer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Caryn C. Lederer (Lederer, Caryn)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Joshua Karsh and Substitute Counsel Within the Same Firm by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Fairness Hearing held on 9/28/2018 re (145 in 1:12-cv-00210-WCG) Unopposed MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement . The Court grants the Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement and Order for Distribution of Funds in both cases. The Court vacates previous orders that were appealed. (Tape #092818) (cav)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 TEXT ONLY ORDER approving #244 Letter request that plaintiffs' Chicago counsel be allowed to appear at the Friday, September 28, 2018 hearing via telephone, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 09/25/2018. To the extent plaintiffs' counsel has not already done so, they shall provide the Green Bay Office of the Clerk with the appropriate direct dial telephone number for Chicago counsel forthwith. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 LETTER from Joshua Karsh . (Karsh, Joshua)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 DECLARATION of Benjamin Richard Botts (Karsh, Joshua)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #241 Unopposed MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Their Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2: Order)(Karsh, Joshua)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER REGARDING DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT AMOUNTS signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 6/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 Class Names and Seasons Worked, #2 Ex 2 Claim Form) (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 6/29/2018. Final Fairness Hearing set for 9/28/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach.) (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Modified Order Regarding Distribution of Settlement Amounts by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1: Order Regarding Distribution of Settlement Amounts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order Regarding Distribution of Settlement Amounts)(Karsh, Joshua)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by All Defendants. (Kruzel, Steven)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/27/2018. Fairness Hearing set for 9/28/2018 09:00 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #062718) (mac)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 TEXT ONLY ORDER The defendants' signatures do not appear to be on the settlement agreement [234-1]. The court directs the defendants to supplement the record with a signature page reflecting their agreement, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 06/27/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Fairness Hearing set for 9/28/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Parties may have the option to appear by telephone. (cc: all counsel)(mac)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #233 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of a Class and Collective Action Settlement and Approval of the Form and Manner of Class Settlement Notice . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Joint Stipulation of Class and Collective Action Settlement and Release, #2 Exhibit 2: ORDER Regarding Distribution of Settlement Amounts, #3 Exhibit 3: Class Notice)(Karsh, Joshua)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of a Class and Collective Action Settlement and Approval of the Form and Manner of Class Settlement Notice by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Hearing: AT&T Telephone Status Conference set for 6/27/2018 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 1234. All participants are to confirm their appearance with the Clerk prior to the date of the hearing. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER of USCA re (198 in 1:12-cv-00209-WCG and 130 in 1:12-cv-00210-WCG) Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC, and (226 in 1:12-cv-00209-WCG) Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC. This case is REMANDED for the limited purpose of conducting class action settlement approval proceedings. The USCA will retain jurisdiction over the matter. Status report to be filed with USCA by 9/17/2018 or within 10 days of an order approving settlement. (tlf)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 USCA Case Number 18-2227 re: #226 Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC. (tlf)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #226 Notice of Appeal (mac)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Attorney Cover Letter re: #226 Notice of Appeal (mac)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Docketing Statement by All Defendants re #226 Notice of Appeal (cc: all counsel) (Kruzel, Steven)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Defendants. Filing Fee PAID $505, receipt number 0757-2845738 (cc: all counsel) (Kruzel, Steven)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 FINAL ORDER ON ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 LETTER from Michael Aldana . (Aldana, Michael)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 4/19/2018 granting in part and denying in part #214 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall pay to Plaintiffs the amount of $70,322.53 in attorneys' fees and expenses. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #214 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (for work after September 30, 2017). (mac)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #220 MOTION for leave to file a reply brief in support of Plaintiffs' motion for supplemental attorneys' fees by All Plaintiffs, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 04/12/2018. The Clerk is directed to detach and docket Plaintiffs' reply brief. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Leave to File to File Instanter a Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion For Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Their Motion for Supplemental Attorneys Fees and Expenses)(Karsh, Joshua)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #214 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (for work after September 30, 2017) . (Kruzel, Steven)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #217 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to April 3, 2018, to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, filed by Ryan A Downs and GLK Foods LLC, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/26/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by All Defendants. (Kruzel, Steven)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 DECLARATION of Bruce Goldstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Farmworker Justice Time Records)(Karsh, Joshua)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 DECLARATION of Joshua Karsh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-HSPRD Time Records, #2 Exhibit B-HSPRD Expenses)(Karsh, Joshua)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Supplemental Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (for work after September 30, 2017) by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 2/12/2018. Plaintiff's #210 Motion for entry of judgment awarding attorneys' fees and expenses awarded and for a submission date is granted-in-part and denied-in-part. Plaintiffs must file their supplemental petition for attorneys' fees and expenses on or before 3/14/18. Defendants' response is due fifteen days thereafter. Plaintiffs should not submit a reply brief absent further order from the court. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 LETTER from Michael Aldana . (Aldana, Michael)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing Defendants to respond or indicate that they do not object to #210 MOTION for Entry of Judgment Awarding Attorneys Fees and Expenses Awarded, and for Submission Date for Supplemental Petition for Subsequently Incurred Attorneys Fees and Expenses by All Plaintiffs on or before February 9, 2018, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 02/05/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION for Entry of Judgment Awarding Attorneys Fees and Expenses Awarded, and for Submission Date for Supplemental Petition for Subsequently Incurred Attorneys Fees and Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/23/18 granting in part and denying in part #186 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendants shall pay to the Plaintiff the amount of $823,556.15 in attorneys' fees and expenses. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 DECLARATION of Weeun Wang in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Karsh, Joshua)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #186 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Time Entries Challenged by Defendants)(Karsh, Joshua)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #205 Response to Motion filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC, #206 Response to Motion, filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC ; The incorrect event was chosen; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (mac)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 AFFIDAVIT of Steven Kruzel in Support of Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Affidavit of Steven Kruzel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C (Kruzel, Steven) Modified on 11/28/2017 to correct filing event (mac).
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #186 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses . (Kruzel, Steven) Modified on 11/28/2017 to correct filing event (mac).
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Appeal Record Prepared re #198 Notice of Appeal (lh)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #203 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response to Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees and expenses by all Defendants, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/07/2017. Defendants' response brief is due November 27, 2017 and Plaintiffs' reply brief is due December 11, 2017. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response To Plaintiffs' Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by All Defendants. (Kruzel, Steven)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 USCA Case Number 17-3248 re: #198 Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC. (tlf)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #198 Notice of Appeal (lh)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Attorney Cover Letter re: #198 Notice of Appeal (lh)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Docketing Statement by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC re #198 Notice of Appeal (cc: all counsel) (Kruzel, Steven)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC. Filing Fee PAID $505, receipt number 0757-2697854 (cc: all counsel) (Kruzel, Steven)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/23/17 denying #183 Motion to Stay deadline to appeal the final entry of judgment on the merits. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 DECLARATION of Robert L. Graham re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 DECLARATION of John N. Gallo re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 DECLARATION of Douglas M. Werman re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 DECLARATION of Marni Willenson re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 DECLARATION of Cyrus Mehri re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 DECLARATION of Judson H. Miner re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 DECLARATION of Robin Potter re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 DECLARATION of Bruce Goldstein re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Farmworker Justice Time Records, #2 Exhibit B: Farmworker Justice Litigation Expenses)(Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 DECLARATION of Joshua Karsh re Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: HSPRD Time Records, #2 Exhibit B: HSPRD Sample Bills, #3 Exhibit C: Litigation Expenses, #4 Exhibit D: August 9, 2013 Letter from J. Karsh to M. Aldana)(Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #186 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. (Karsh, Joshua)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #183 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Deadline to Appeal Final Entry of Judgment On The Merits Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to "Stay" the Deadline for Appealing the Court's Judgments. (Karsh, Joshua)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing Plaintiffs to respond or indicate that they do not object to #183 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Deadline to Appeal Final Entry of Judgment On The Merits by All Defendants on or before October 20, 2017, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/16/2017. In future filings, it would be helpful to the court if the movant notes whether a motion of this nature is opposed. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Deadline to Appeal Final Entry of Judgment On The Merits by All Defendants. (Kruzel, Steven)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 TEXT ONLY ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING #181 MOTION for leave to file FRCP 58(e) motion, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/12/2017. This decision is subject to reconsideration in the event the plaintiffs object within the next 5 days. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #179 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses And Motion Seeking Leave To File FRCP 58(e) Motion. (Kruzel, Steven)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 TEXT ONLY ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING #179 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by All Plaintiffs, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/11/2017. Plaintiffs' motion is to be filed no later than October 23, 2017. This extension is subject to reconsideration in the event the defendants object and provide persuasive reasons to deny the extension.(cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Their Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 VACATED - SEE #247 Order dated 9/28/2018 - JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk in favor of plaintiffs and against GLK Foods LLC, and Ryan A Downs and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/29/17. (cc: all counsel)(cav) Modified on 9/28/2018 to vacate judgment (cav).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 VACATED - SEE #247 Order dated 9/28/2018 - ORDER FOR JUDGMENT (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William) Modified on 9/28/2018 to vacate order for judgment(cav).
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 LETTER from Steven M. Kruzel . (Kruzel, Steven)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 SUPPLEMENT by All Plaintiffs Distribution Order Exhibit 1 Updated to Include Prejudgment Interest. (Karsh, Joshua)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 SUPPLEMENT by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Calculation of Prejudgment Interest on Judgment Amounts Through 9/29/2017. (Karsh, Joshua)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/18/2017 GRANTING #168 Motion for Approval of a Plan of Distribution of Judgment Amounts. By 9/22/2017, Plaintiffs are directed to submit to the court their calculation of prejudgment interest through 9/29/2017. Defendants may submit a response to Plaintiffs' calculation by 9/27/2017. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #172 Reply Brief in Support of Motion; Certain attachments (Affidavits/Declarations) to this document should have been filed as separate entries. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #168 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of a Plan of Distribution of Judgment Amounts Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion For Approval of a Plan of Distribution. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Michael Sutherland Declaration, #2 Exhibit B: Rachel Micah Jones Declaration, #3 Exhibit C: Mexico Payment Transfer Report, #4 Exhibit D: CDM Quote)(Karsh, Joshua)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER re #168 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of a Plan of Distribution of Judgment. The plaintiff is directed to file a reply brief on or before September 13, 2017. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 RESPONSE filed by All Defendants re #168 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of a Plan of Distribution of Judgment Amounts (Kruzel, Steven)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER directing defendants to notify the court of any objections to the plan of distribution on or before 8/29/2017, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 8/15/2017. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MOTION for Approval of a Plan of Distribution of Judgment Amounts by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B: Visa and Pay Stub Exemplars)(Karsh, Joshua)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/31/2017 (Tape #073117) (mac)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/31/2017 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 LETTER from Letter on behalf of Plaintiffs . (Karsh, Joshua)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 4/10/17 granting #161 Motion to add amounts to the Court's itemization of damages and granting #162 Motion regarding calculation of prejudgment interest. Defendants GLK Foods, LLC and Ryan A. Downs are jointly and severally liable in the amount of $837,518.07 as set forth in this order. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #166 Letter request on behalf of plaintiffs, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 04/10/2017. Due to the need to retain jurisdiction in order to review and approve a plan for distribution of judgment amounts to class members, the clerk will withhold entering judgment. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #161 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion Requesting the Addition of $23,124 Plus Prejudgment Interest to the Court Itemization of Damages, Based on Previously Agreed Upon Amounsts Owed to Named Plaintiffs Who Did Not Receive 40 Hours of Pay in Some Weeks . (Kruzel, Steven)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE filed by All Defendants to Plaintiffs' Calculation of Prejudgment Interest on Judgment Amounts by All Plaintiffs (Kruzel, Steven)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION Plaintiffs' Calculation of Prejudgment Interest on Judgment Amounts by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion Requesting the Addition of $23,124 Plus Prejudgment Interest to the Court Itemization of Damages, Based on Previously Agreed Upon Amounsts Owed to Named Plaintiffs Who Did Not Receive 40 Hours of Pay in Some Weeks by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Defendants are to respond to #161 MOTION Plaintiffs Motion Requesting the Addition of $23,124 Plus Prejudgment Interest to the Court Itemization of Damages, Based on Previously Agreed Upon Amounts Owed to Named Plaintiffs Who Did Not Receive 40 Hours of Pay in Some Weeks by All Plaintiffs on or before April 6, 2017, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/27/2017. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 DECISION AND ORDER ON DAMAGES resulting from the court's orders #119 and #134 AND GRANTING #159 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3/17/2017. Plaintiffs are directed to submit to the court its calculation of prejudgment interest by 3/27/2017. Defendants may submit a response to Plaintiffs calculation by 3/30/2017. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Consolidated Post-Hearing Reply Brief Addressing Damages by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Sur-Reply Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Consolidated Post-Hearing Reply Brief Addressing Damages)(Kruzel, Steven)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPLY filed by All Defendants In Support Of Its Position On Statutory Damages. (Kruzel, Steven)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 REPLY filed by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Consolidated Post-Hearing Reply Addressing Damages for Case Nos. 12-cv-209 & 12-cv-210. (Karsh, Joshua)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #156 Brief (Non-Motion), filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC ; All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (cav)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 BRIEF filed by All Defendants In Support Of Its Position On Statutory Damages. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven Kruzel in Support of Defendants' Brief In Support of Its Position On Statutory Damages, #2 Exhibit A - December 19, 2016 Hearing Transcript Record, #3 Exhibit B - Santiago v. Tamarack Tree Co.)(Kruzel, Steven)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 BRIEF filed by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Consolidated Post-Hearing Brief Addressing Damages. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Ps Reply Brief Addressing Damages, 11-1-16, #2 Exhibit B: Transcript of Hearing on Damages, 12-19-2016, #3 Exhibit C: WMLA 1977 Drafting Notes, #4 Exhibit D: Affidavit of Monica Garreton Chavez)(Karsh, Joshua)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Kruzel on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven M. Kruzel (Kruzel, Steven)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT of HEARING ON DAMAGES held on 12/19/2016 before Judge William C Griesbach Court Reporter/Transcriber John Schindhelm, Contact at WWW.JOHNSCHINDHELM.COM to order directly... Or. Transcripts may be purchased using the Transcript Order Form found #on our website or viewed at the court public terminal. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: If necessary, within 7 business days each party shall inform the Court of their intent to redact personal identifiers by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact. Please read the policy located on our website # www.wied.uscourts.gov Redaction Statement due 2/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2017. (Schindhelm, John)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 SUPPLEMENT by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Designations of Deposition Testimony Offered as Evidence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Deposition Transcript of Rafael Jimenez Arroyo, 6-3-13, #2 Exhibit B: Deposition Transcript of Thomas Robinson, 2-26-13, #3 Exhibit C: Deposition Transcript of Jorge Garcia, 2-27-13)(Karsh, Joshua)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 EXHIBITS received for All Parties Exhibit list filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List) (cav)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/19/2016. (Tape #121916) (cav)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY filed by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Addressing Damages for Cases Nos. 12-cv-209 & 12-cv-210. (Karsh, Joshua)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 BRIEF filed by All Defendants Memorandum of Law and Response to #143 Plaintiffs' Submission on Statutory Damages. (Aldana, Michael)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER. Defendant's shall file response brief to Plaintiff's damages submission on or before 10/17/16. Plaintiff's Reply is due 11/1/16. Parties are to exchange hearing exhibits on or before 10/17/16. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 LETTER from Michael Aldana . (Aldana, Michael)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Status Conference held on 9/23/2016. Evidentiary Hearing as to Damages set for 12/19/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 201, 125 S. Jefferson St., Green Bay, WI 54301 before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The parties are to disclose witnesses and factors upon which the parties intend to rely on in support of respective damage arguments by 10/10/2016. Depositions are to be arranged so they are completed before 11/24/2016. (Tape #092316) (lh)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Report & Corrected Statement of Prejudgment Interest by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 BRIEF filed by All Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Supplemental Damages Submission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Affidavit of Monica Chavez, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-August 29, 2016 Correspondence from Mr. Karsh to Mr. Aldana)(Karsh, Joshua)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 LETTER from Michael Aldana . (Aldana, Michael)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 9/13/2016. (Tape #091316) (lh)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel) Telephone Conference set for 9/13/2016 at 1:30 PM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 0209. All participants are to confirm their appearance with the Clerk prior to the time of the hearing. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 LETTER from Michael Aldana . (Aldana, Michael)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Telephone Status Conference set for 9/23/2016 09:00 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 0209. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov prior to the day of the hearing. Please contact the Office of the Clerk at (920) 455-7381.(lh)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 7/12/2016. Damage Submissions due by 9/15/2016. Telephone Status Conference scheduled before Chief Judge William C. Griesbach on 9/23/16 at 9:00 AM. (Tape #071216) (lh)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing with REVISED INSTRUCTIONS: (cc: all counsel) TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2016 09:30 AM By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. PARTICIPANTS ARE TO CALL in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 0209. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov - please contact the Office of the Clerk at (920) 455-7381 if you should have any questions. (lh)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE OF TELEPHONE HEARING: (cc: all counsel) Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2016 09:30 AM by Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. An appearance by telephone requires the person appearing to provide the telephone number at which he or she can be reached to the Office of the Clerk by e-mail (wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov) or by telephone (920-455-7381) prior to the hearing date.(Griesbach, William)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 DECISION & ORDER denying #109 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #113 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #115 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for full detail. Signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 5/23/2016. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER approving #132 Unopposed MOTION for Nicholas Marritz to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs and #133 Unopposed MOTION of Ali Beydoun to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 04/21/2016. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ali Beydoun by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicholas Marritz by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce Goldstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Bruce Goldstein (Goldstein, Bruce)
June 6, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #127 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance as Counsel by Claudia Flores, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 06/05/2015. Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by other members of HSPRD and Farmworker Justice. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI and VIII of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint . (Aldana, Michael)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #115 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Class Members' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI, VII, and VIII Class Members' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI, VII and VIII. (Karsh, Joshua)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff Classes Motions For Partial Summary Judgment For Violations Under The AWPA And The WMLA Of Requirements To (1) Provide Disclosures Of Terms Of Employment, (2) Provide Work Agreements, (3) Not Take Unaut Class Members' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Violations of the AWPA and WMLA - Arising from Defendants' Failures to: (1) Provide Written Disclosures at the Time of Recruitment, (2) Provide Written Work Agreements, (3) Make and Keep Records, and (4) Refrain from Taking Unauthorized Wage Deductions. (Karsh, Joshua)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance as Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Flores, Claudia)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE filed by All Defendants re #117 Statement of Fact (Aldana, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiff Classes Motions For Partial Summary Judgment For Violations Under The AWPA And The WMLA Of Requirements To (1) Provide Disclosures Of Terms Of Employment, (2) Provide Work Agreements, (3) Not Take Unaut, #115 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Class Members' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI, VII, and VIII . (Aldana, Michael)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE filed by All Plaintiffs re #111 Statement of Fact Plaintiff Class Members' Response to Defendants' Proposed Material Facts and Statement of Additional Facts Requiring the Denial of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI and VIII (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Deposition of Jacci Carlson, 7-30-13 (excerpt), #2 Exhibit B: Deposition of Gina Maria Pahl, 6-6-13 (excerpt))(Karsh, Joshua)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE filed by All Plaintiffs Class Members' Response to #110 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Counts III, VI and VIII of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Karsh, Joshua)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #122 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Response Briefing Deadline For Summary Judgment to May 15, 2015, filed by Ryan A Downs and GLK Foods LLC, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 04/29/2015. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule For Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 4/1/2015 granting #121 Unopposed Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment. Response briefs due 5/5/2015; Reply Briefs due 6/5/2015. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule For Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SUR-REPLY filed by All Plaintiffs re #92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Count I Of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (aw)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #92 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #104 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3/24/2015. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #118 MOTION to Withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs by Attorney Jenna Miara, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/19/2015. Attorney Miara terminated. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Miara, Jenna)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CONSOLIDATED STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by All Plaintiffs in support of #113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment For Violations Under The AWPA and the WMLA of Requirements to (1) Provide Disclosures Of Terms Of Employment, (2) Provide Work Agreements, (3) Not Take Unauthorized Deductions from Wages, and (4) Make and Keep Records of Permanent Addresses of the Named Plaintiffs and #115 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI, VII, and VIII. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jimenez Defendants Answer to Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 78), #2 Exhibit 2 - 8/22/11 Letter from R. Downs to Congressman Reid, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition of Ryan A. Downs, #4 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Betty Miller, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2005-2006 Trim Line Laborers Payroll Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2007-2008 Trim Line Laborers Payroll Report, #7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition of Rafael Jimenez Arroyo, #8 Exhibit 8 - U.S. DOL Application for Temporary Employment Certification, ETA FORM 9142 - 2010, #9 Exhibit 9 - USDOL Application for Temporary Employment Certification, ETA FORM 9142 - 2011, #10 Exhibit 10 - USDOL Application for Alien Employment Certification - 2006, #11 Exhibit 11 - Deposition of Donna Lorge Excerpts, #12 Exhibit 12 - GLK U.S. DOL Application for Alien Employment Certification 2007, #13 Exhibit 13 - U.S. DOL Application for Alien Employment Certification - 2008, #14 Exhibit 14 - GLK U.S. DOL Application for Alien Employment Certification November 2007, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2007 H-2B Returning Worker Attestation, #16 Exhibit 16 - LaborQuest H-2B Employer Requirements - 2010, #17 Exhibit 17 - GLK Employment Advertisements, #18 Exhibit 18 - The Associates/D. Guerrero/ GLK Documents, #19 Exhibit 19 - Jimenez Defendants Second Revised Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #20 Exhibit 20 - Deposition of Jorge Garcia, #21 Exhibit 21 - Deposition of Thomas Robinson Excerpts, #22 Exhibit 22 - Ramirez Defendants Answer to Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Dkt. No. 41), #23 Exhibit 23 - Declaration of Elias Vera Ramirez, #24 Exhibit 24 - GLK Lists of H-2B Workers, #25 Exhibit 25 - Deposition of Jacci Carlson Excerpts, #26 Exhibit 26 part 1 of 7- Jimenez Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #27 Exhibit 26 part 2 of 7 - Jimenez Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #28 Exhibit 26 part 3 of 7 - Jimenez Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #29 Exhibit 26 part 4 of 7 - Jimenez Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #30 Exhibit 26 part 5 of 7 - Jimenez Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #31 Exhibit 26 part 6 of 7 - Jimenez Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #32 Exhibit 26 part 7 of 7 - Jimenez Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #33 Exhibit 27 - Jimenez Defendants Responses to Plaintiffs Fourth Set of Interrogatories, #34 Exhibit 28 - GLK 2006-2008 and 2010-2011 H-2B Employee List, #35 Exhibit 29 - Ramirez Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #36 Exhibit 30 - USDOL-WHD Compliance Action Report 2011, #37 Exhibit 31 - 7/22/11 Invoice from LaborQuest to GLK, #38 Exhibit 32 - 7/21/11 Email Correspondence Between J. Carlson and T. Robinson; T. Robinson and J. Garcia, #39 Exhibit 33 - Payroll Records, #40 Exhibit 34 - 2010 List of GLK Workers, #41 Exhibit 35 - 2011 List of GLK Workers, #42 Exhibit 36 - LaborQuest/GLK List of H-2B Workers With 8/10/2010 Interviews in Mexico City, #43 Exhibit 37 - 8/5/11 Email from J. Garcia to J. Carlson, #44 Exhibit 38 - 8/22/11 Email from J. Garcia to J. Carlson, #45 Exhibit 39 - List of GLK H-2B Workers with First Week of September 2011 Interviews (Third Group), #46 Exhibit 40 - 8/30/11 9/1/11 Email Correspondence Between J. Garcia and M. Detrick, #47 Exhibit 41 - Deposition of Jiovanni Mendez Lancon Excerpts, #48 Exhibit 42 - Deposition of Javier Jimenez Vera Excerpts, #49 Exhibit 43 - 9/1/11 Email from J. Garcia to S. Murillo, #50 Exhibit 44 - Cancelled Visas - Ramirez Plaintiffs, #51 Exhibit 45 - Ramirez Defendants Second Revised Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #52 Exhibit 46 - Deposition of Gina Maria Pahl Excerpts, #53 Exhibit 47 - Maps - Distance from Santiago Capitiro to Matamoros and Santiago Capitiro to Mexico City, #54 Exhibit 48 - Deposition of Jesus Martinez Gallardo Excerpts, #55 Exhibit 49 - Deposition of J. Saul Jimenez Rosas Excerpts, #56 Exhibit 50 - Deposition of Jose Mendez Baca Excerpts, #57 Exhibit 51 - Deposition of J. Jesus Jimenez Rosas Excerpts, #58 Exhibit 52 - Visa Application Fees, #59 Exhibit 53 - I-94 Border Crossing Receipts, #60 Exhibit 54 - Spreadsheet of H-2B Workers Expenses in 2010 and 2011, #61 Exhibit 55 - Affidavit of Monica Garreton Chavez, #62 Exhibit 56 - Deposition of Martin Chavez Jimenez Excerpts, #63 Exhibit 57 - Deposition of Alejandro Jurado Jimenez Excerpts, #64 Exhibit 58 - Deposition of Jose Jurado Jurado Excerpts, #65 Exhibit 59 - Deposition of Enrique Rosas Jurado Excerpts, #66 Exhibit 60 - February 2011 LaborQuest to GLK, H-2B Program Costs Breakdown, #67 Exhibit 61 - February 2011, LaborQuest to GLK, H-2B Program Requirements, #68 Exhibit 62 - Spreadsheet of Net Wages and Damages Due in 2010 and 2011, #69 Exhibit 63 - 9/29/11 Email from J. Garcia to J. Carlson, #70 Exhibit 64 - 9/16/10 Invoice, Bus from Bear Creek, WI to Laredo, TX., #71 Exhibit 65 - 9/26/2011 Invoice, Bus from Appleton, WI to Laretdo, TX, #72 Exhibit 66 - 9/22/11 Email from J. Garcia to J. Carlson, #73 Exhibit 67 - Return Bus Receipts from Nuevo Laredo to Salvatierra, #74 Exhibit 68 - 8/2/10 Email from B. Miller to T. Robinson and G. Garcia, #75 Exhibit 69 - 4/9/10 Email Correspondence Between T. Robinson and B. Miller, #76 Exhibit 70 - 10/26/09 Email Correspondence Between T. Robinson and B. Miller, #77 Exhibit 71 - 9/22/11 Email from J. Carlson to V. Zuleger and R. Downs, #78 Exhibit 72 - Krop Rite Harvesting Inc./Cabioch Bontemps/GLK Payment Documents ($10.25 per hour), #79 Exhibit 73 - Payroll records for Krop Rite Workers ($8.00 per hour), #80 Exhibit 74 - Department of Workforce Development Documents Krop Rite Compliance, #81 Exhibit 75 - 1/16/12 Email from D. Lorge to G. Tegen, #82 Exhibit 76 - 2/2/12 Letter from G. Tegen to R. Downs, #83 Exhibit 77 - 1/30/12 Email from G. Tegen to J. Lopez and H. Bernstein, #84 Exhibit 78 - 2007, 2008, 2010, and 2011 Migrant Labor Camp Certifications, #85 Exhibit 79 - 7/7/11 Letter from G. Tegen to J. Carlson, #86 Exhibit 80 - 7/8/11 Email from J. Carlson to D. Miller, J. McCoy, #87 Exhibit 81 - USDOL WHISARD Compliance Action Report, No. 2008-250-04054 (2008), #88 Exhibit 82 - USDOL WHISARD Compliance Action Report, No. 2002-241-00382 (2002), #89 Exhibit 83 - USDOL Investigation Report, Case ID 1224825 (2002), #90 Exhibit 84 - USDOL WHISARD Compliance Action Report, No. 2010-250-05529 (2010), #91 Exhibit 85 - USDOL WHISARD Compliance Action Report, No. 2012-250-06320 (2011), #92 Exhibit 86 - 1/15/13 Letter to R. Downs from K. Tout, #93 Exhibit 87 - 3/30/07 Letter from G. Limpert to J. Lopez, #94 Exhibit 88 - 3/12/07 Letter from G. Limpert to J. Lopez re: additional information for GLK, #95 Exhibit 89 - 10/15/08 Letter from G. Limpert to B. Miller, #96 Exhibit 90 - 10/20/11 Email from J. Lopez to H. Bernstein, #97 Exhibit 91 - Stipulation, 11/25/13, #98 Exhibit 92 - DWD Standard Form Work Agreement, #99 Exhibit 93 - USDOL Form WH-518, #100 Exhibit 94 - Plaintiff Earning Statements, #101 Exhibit 95 - GLK Authorized Deduction Forms (2006-2010), #102 Exhibit 96 - GLK Seasonal Personal Data Sheets (2011), #103 Exhibit 97 - 2011 Worker Documents (Ex. 13 Deposition of J. Carlson), #104 Exhibit 98 - 2011 Pay Records with $75 Housing Deduction, #105 Exhibit 99 - Affidavit of Cynthia Brito, #106 Exhibit 100 - 2011 GLK Employee Check View Summary, #107 Exhibit 101 - 8/22/11 Email from T. Robinson to J. Carlson, #108 Exhibit 102 - Jimenez Defendants Revised Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #109 Exhibit 103 - Map Distance from Laredo to Santiago Capitiro, #110 Exhibit 104 - 9/8/11 Email from R. Downs to GLK Personnel)(Karsh, Joshua)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #115 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI, VII, and VIII. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished cases, #2 Exhibit B - WMLA original bill 1977, #3 Exhibit C - 2009 regulations)(Karsh, Joshua)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI, VII, and VIII by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment For Violations Under The AWPA and the WMLA of Requirements to (1) Provide Disclosures Of Terms Of Employment, (2) Provide Work Agreements, (3) Not Take Unauthorized Deductions from Wages, and (4) Make and Keep Records of Permanent Addresses of the Named Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases, #2 Exhibit B - WMLA Original Bill 1977)(Karsh, Joshua)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment For Violations Under The AWPA and the WMLA of Requirements to (1) Provide Disclosures Of Terms Of Employment, (2) Provide Work Agreements, (3) Not Take Unauthorized Deductions from Wages, and (4) Make and Keep Records of Permanent Addresses of the Named Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Aldana in Support of #109 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count III, VI and VIII. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Aldana, Michael)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STATEMENT OF FACT by All Defendants in Support of #109 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI and VIII. (Aldana, Michael)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI and VIII of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint . (Aldana, Michael)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts III, VI and VIII of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali A Beydoun on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Ali Beydoun (Beydoun, Ali)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #106 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Consolidated Oversized Rule 56.1 Statement and proposed briefing schedule is adopted, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 02/19/2015. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #106 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Consolidated Oversized Rule 56.1 Statement And Proposed Briefing Schedule On Motions For Summary Judgment. (Aldana, Michael)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER regarding #106 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Consolidated Oversized Rule 56.1 Statement, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 02/17/2015. Plaintiffs or Defendants should advise the Court whether there are any objections to Plaintiffs' motion on or before February 19, 2015. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Consolidated Oversized Rule 56.1 Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING re #105 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Parties To File Motions For Summary Judgment filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC. Signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 2/10/2015. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time For Parties To File Motions For Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Instanter a Sur-Reply in Further Support of Their Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Flores, Claudia)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Defendants re #92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Count I Of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint . (Aldana, Michael)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #102 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Its Reply Brief In Support Of Its Partial Motion For Summary Judgment, filed by Ryan A Downs and GLK Foods LLC, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/21/2014. An extension of time to file the reply brief on their partial motion for summary judgment is extended through December 2, 2014. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Its Reply Brief In Support Of Its Partial Motion For Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #85 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act and BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to #92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I Of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A: DOL Field Assistance Bulletin 2009-2, Travel and Visa Expenses of H-2B Workers Under the FLSA, #3 Exhibit B: Deposition of Jorge Garcia, Excerpts, #4 Exhibit C: Deposition of Tom Robinson, Excerpts, #5 Exhibit D: Deposition of Gina Pahl, Excerpts, #6 Exhibit E: Deposition of Jacci Carlson, Excerpts, #7 Exhibit F: Deposition of Ryan A. Downs, Excerpts, #8 Exhibit G: Deposition of Alejandro Jurado Jimenez, Excerpts, #9 Exhibit H: Deposition of J. Jesus Jimenez Rosas, Excerpts, #10 Exhibit I: Email from Tom Robinson to Jacci Carlson re: delay in wage increase, FL0095-97)(Flores, Claudia) Modified on 2/27/2015 (tlf).
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE to #94 Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact in support of their #92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I Of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (Flores, Claudia)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Motion Hearing held on 10/8/2014 re (52 in 1:12-cv-00210-WCG) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Additional Dispositive MotionsVicente Baca Jurado, Alejandro Ruiz Rosas (52 in 1:12-cv-00210-WCG) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Additional Dispositive Motions and Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Class Notice filed by plaintiffs. The Court GRANTS both motions. Motions due by 2/13/2015. (Tape #100814) (cav)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #53 in 12-cv-00210 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Class Notice and #98 in 12-cv-00209 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Class Notice, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/08/2014. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Class Notice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Notice, #2 Exhibit B: Radio Ad)(Karsh, Joshua)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)TELEPHONE Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2014 10:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Counsel are to appear by telephone. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the Office of the Clerk with the telephone number at which they can be reached.(cav)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING IN PART #97 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Schedule on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment on Count I AND for Extension of Time to File Additional Dispositive Motions, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10/02/2014. The extension of time to file briefs on the pending motions is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' time to file their combined response and reply is extended through November 7, 2014. Defendants time to file their reply is extended through November 24, 2014. However, the motion for an extension of time to file dispositive motions is held in abeyance. The Clerk is directed to set a telephone conference wherein the Court will address the extension request regarding the dispositive motion deadline. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Schedule on Cross Motions for Summary Judgment on Count I and for Extension of Time to File Additional Dispositive Motions by All Plaintiffs. (Miara, Jenna)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Aldana in opposition to #85 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act and in support of #92 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I Of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Aldana, Michael)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE filed by all Defendants to #87 Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts filed in Support of #85 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act . (Aldana, Michael)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Proposed Findings of Fact by All Defendants in support of their #92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Count I Of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (Aldana, Michael)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to #85 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act and BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #92 Defendants' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Count I Of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by all Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment On Count I Of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #91 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to September 24, 2014 to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and to File Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 09/19/2014. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Judgment And To File Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment From September 22, 2014 to September 24, 2014 by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING ECF #51 in 12-cv-00210 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Weeun Wang to Withdraw as Counsel AND GRANTING ECF #90 in 12-cv-00209 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Weeun Wang to Withdraw as Counsel, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 08/28/2014. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Weeun Wang to Withdraw as Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Flores, Claudia)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to September 22, 2014 to respond to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and to file cross-motions for summary judgment filed by Ryan A Downs and GLK Foods LLC, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 08/07/2014. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Judgment And To File Cross-Motions For Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/8/2014. (Tape #070814) (cav)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by All Plaintiffs in Support of #85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Violation of the Fair Labor Standards Act. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1: Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. 67, #3 Exhibit 2: GLK U.S. DOL Application for Temporary Employment Certification, ETA FORM 9142 2010, GLK001373-78, 2283, #4 Exhibit 3: GLK U.S. DOL Application for Temporary Employment Certification, ETA FORM 9142 2011, ETA-FOIA0004-11, #5 Exhibit 4: Defendants Answer to Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. 78, #6 Exhibit 5: Deposition of Ryan A. Downs, Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6: Downs Letter Stating Inability to Find U.S Workers 2003, GLK002378, #8 Exhibit 7: GLK Summary of Temporary and Permanent Workers Performing Trim Line Labor in 2005-06, GLK001232, #9 Exhibit 8: GLK Summary of Temporary and Permanent Workers Performing Trim Line Labor in 2007-08, GLK001296, #10 Exhibit 9: Deposition of Rafael Jimenez Arroyo, Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 10: GLK U.S. DOL Application for Alien Employment Certification 2006, GLK001116-17, #12 Exhibit 11: GLK U.S. DOL Application for Alien Employment Certification 2008, OFLC-FOIA0085-86, #13 Exhibit 12: GLK U.S. DOL Application for Alien Employment Certification March 2007, GLK001220-21, #14 Exhibit 13: GLK U.S. DOL Application for Alien Employment Certification November 2007, OFLC-FOIA0117-118, #15 Exhibit 14: GLK H-2B Returning Worker Attestation 2007, GLK001943, #16 Exhibit 15: LaborQuest to GLK H-2B Employer Requirements 2010, GLK001331-1335, #17 Exhibit 16: GLK H-2B Wage Waiver Request 2011, GLK006240, #18 Exhibit 17: Downs Letter to Congressman Ribble, 2011, GLK002552, #19 Exhibit 18: Downs Letter to U.S DOL Protesting H-2B Wage Increase, 2011, GLK006169-70, #20 Exhibit 19: US DOL Investigation Report of GLK, 2010, WHD-FOIA00331-41, #21 Exhibit 20: US DOL Investigation Report of GLK, 2011, WHD-FOIA0045-55, #22 Exhibit 21: Wisconsin Dept. of Workforce Development- Migrant Work Agreement Deficiencies in GLK, DWD0047, #23 Exhibit 22: U.S. DOL Investigation Report of GLK 2008, WHD-FOIA0007-20, #24 Exhibit 23: U.S. DOL Compliance Action Report for GLK 2008, WHD-FOIA0003-5, #25 Exhibit 24: U.S. DOL Compliance Action Report for GLK 2003, WHD-FOIA0023-25, #26 Exhibit 25: U.S. DOL Investigation Report of GLK 2002, WHD-FOIA0026-32, #27 Exhibit 26: Downs Email re: Overtime of H-2B workers, August 25, 2011, GLK006228, #28 Exhibit 27: Downs Email re: Overtime of H-2B workers, August 15, 2011, GLK006222, #29 Exhibit 28: Deposition of Betty Miller, Excerpts, #30 Exhibit 29: GLK US DOL Final Determination of H-2B Application, 2010, GLK001371-72, #31 Exhibit 30: GLK US DOL Final Determination of H-2B Application, 2011, GLK001460-61, #32 Exhibit 31: Downs Email re: Preference for H-2B Workers, August 23, 2011, GLK006232, #33 Exhibit 32: Defendants Second Revised Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 9, 11, #34 Exhibit 33: Deposition of Jorge Garcia, Excerpts, #35 Exhibit 34: Deposition of Thomas Robinson, Excerpts, #36 Exhibit 35: Declaration of Elias Vera Ramirez, P1499-1505, #37 Exhibit 36: GLK Lists of H-2B Workers, LQ0277-LQ0285, #38 Exhibit 37: Jimenez Arroyo Lists of H-2B Workers, FL0468-FL0471, #39 Exhibit 38: LaborQuest/FLECTS email to GLK re: Jimenez Arroyo as H-2B worker contact, GLK001597-1598, #40 Exhibit 39: Deposition of Donna Lorge, Excerpts, #41 Exhibit 40: Deposition of Jacci Carlson, Excerpts, #42 Exhibit 41: GLK Lists of H-2B Workers Hired, GLK002287-2289, #43 Exhibit 42: GLK Lists of H-2B Workers with Sub-recruiter Contacts, LQ0290-0292, #44 Exhibit 43: GLK Initial List of Potential H-2B Workers, GLK002269-2274, #45 Exhibit 44: I-129 GLK Petition for Non-Immigrant Worker 2010, USCIS-FOIA0329-340, #46 Exhibit 45: I-129 GLK Petition for Non-Immigrant Worker 2011, USCIS-FOIA0019-33, #47 Exhibit 46: LaborQuest/GLK List of H-2B Workers with visa interviews 2010, FL00480-481, #48 Exhibit 47: Deposition of Jesus Martinez Gallardo, Excerpts, #49 Exhibit 48: Plaintiffs Receipts for Derecho a Visa Fee (DAV), P0045, P0264, P0307, P0582, P1102, #50 Exhibit 49: Plaintiffs I-94 Border Crossing Receipts, P0179, P0497, P0608, P0777, P0939, P0969, #51 Exhibit 50, part 1: Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #52 Exhibit 50, part 1a: Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #53 Exhibit 50, part 2: Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #54 Exhibit 50, part 2a: Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #55 Exhibit 50, part 3: Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #56 Exhibit 50, part 3a: Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #57 Exhibit 50, part 4: Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #58 Exhibit 50, part 4a: Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, #59 Exhibit 51:Spreadsheet of H-2B Workers Expenses in 2010 and 2011, #60 Exhibit 52: Deposition of Jose Mendez Baca, Excerpts, #61 Exhibit 53: Deposition of Martin Chavez Jimenez, Excerpts, #62 Exhibit 54: Deposition of Alejandro Jurado Jimenez, Excerpts, #63 Exhibit 55: Deposition of Jose Jurado Jurado, Excerpts, #64 Exhibit 56: Deposition of J. Saul Jimenez Rosas, Excerpts, #65 Exhibit 57: Deposition of Enrique Rosas Jurado, Excerpts, #66 Exhibit 58: Deposition of J. Jesus Jimenez Rosas, Excerpts, #67 Exhibit 59: GLK email re: early return of H-2B workers in 2011, GLK005981, #68 Exhibit 60: LaborQuest invoice to GLK, GLK001614, #69 Exhibit 61: LaborQuest to GLK H-2B Program Costs Breakdown 2011, GLK001471, #70 Exhibit 62: LaborQuest to GLK H-2B Program Requirements 2011, LQ0124-125, #71 Exhibit 63: Spreadsheet of Net Wages and Damages Due in 2010 and 2011, #72 Exhibit 64: Affidavit of Monica Garreton Chavez, #73 Exhibit 65: DOL Field Assistance Bulletin 2009-2, Travel and Visa Experiences of H-2B Workers Under the FLSA, #74 Exhibit 66: Recruitment Revealed: Fundamental Flaws in the H-2 Temporary Worker Program and Recommendations for Change)(Karsh, Joshua) Modified on 2/27/2015 (tlf).
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #85 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act. (Karsh, Joshua)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #87 Statement of Fact. All documents should contain an electronic signature. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (mec)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)TELEPHONE Status Conference set for 7/8/2014 09:00 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. Instructions: Participants are to call in to 1-888-273-3658, using Access Code 4416978, and Security Code 0209. Please be sure to call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Unless otherwise excused, all participants are expected to remain on the call for the duration of the conference. All participants are to confirm their appearance with the Clerk prior to the date of the hearing. Verification of your participation should be sent to wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov. Please contact the Office of the Clerk at 920-455-7381 if you should have any questions. (aw)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Certify Class; granting #70 Motion to Certify Class. Please see order for specific class definitions. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #68 MOTION to Certify Class Counts III, VI, and VIII (Liability Only) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification of Counts III, IV, VI, VII and VIII. (Flores, Claudia)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CORRECTED RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #68 MOTION to Certify Class Counts III, VI, and VIII (Liability Only). (aw)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Version of Brief In Response To Plaintiffs' Motions For Class Certification filed by Ryan A Downs, GLK Foods LLC, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 02/21/2014. The Clerk is directed to detach and file the corrected brief attached to ECF #81 . (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Version of Brief In Response To Plaintiffs' Motions For Class Certification by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Brief)(Aldana, Michael)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 2/7/2014 granting #80 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' reply in support of its Motions to Certify Class #68 and #70 will be due on or before 2/24/2014. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by All Plaintiffs. (Flores, Claudia)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 See Corrected RESPONSE to Motion #82 filed by All Defendants re #68 MOTION to Certify Class Counts III, VI, and VIII (Liability Only), #70 MOTION to Certify Class Counts IV, V, and VII (Liability and Damages) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Aldana, Michael) Modified on 2/24/2014 (aw).
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Defendants ANSWER to #67 Amended Complaint by All Defendants.(Aldana, Michael)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CORRECTED BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #70 MOTION to Certify Class Counts IV, V, and VII (Liability and Damages). (mec)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CORRECTED BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #68 MOTION to Certify Class Counts III, VI, and VIII (Liability Only). (mec)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #75 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum and #74 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/19/2013. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiffs' Corrected Memorandum in Support of Certifying Disclosure, Work Agreement, and Record-Keeping Claims in Counts IV, V, and VII for Class-Wide Adjudication)(Karsh, Joshua)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Memorandum by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Plaintiffs' Corrected Memorandum in Support of Adjudicating, on a Class-Wide Basis, GLK's Liability, Under Counts III, VI, and VIII for not Employing H-2B Workers for the Certified Period of Employment and not Reimbursing them for Visa and Travel Expenses)(Karsh, Joshua)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 APPENDIX by All Plaintiffs to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Certifying Disclosure, Work Agreement, and Record-Keeping Claims in Counts IV, V, and VII for Class-Wide Adjudication. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Ryan Downs, excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Reports by Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development and U.S. Department of Labor, #4 Exhibit D - DWD Disclosure Forms, #5 Exhibit E - Lists of GLK H-2B Workers in 2006-2008 Spreadsheet of H-2B workers employed by GLK in 2010 & 2011, #6 Exhibit F - Interrogatory Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories for Plaintiffs Martin Chavez Jimenez, Jose Jurado Jurado, and Miguel Ortiz Martinez, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Joshua Karsh, Weeun Wang, Claudia Flores and Nicholas Marritz)(Karsh, Joshua)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 APPENDIX by All Plaintiffs to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Adjudicating, on a Class-Wide Basis, GLK's Liability, Under Counts III, VI, and VIII for Not Employing H-2B Workers for the Certified Period of Employment and Not Reimbursing Them for Visa and Travel Expenses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GLK Application for Temporary Employment Certification for 2010 and 2011, #2 Exhibit B - 20 C.F.R. 655.22(d), #3 Exhibit C - Spreadsheet of H-2B workers employed by GLK in 2010 and 2011, #4 Exhibit D - Interrogatory Responses to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories for Plaintiffs Martin Chavez Jimenez, Jose Jurado Jurado, and Miguel Ortiz Martinez)(Karsh, Joshua)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #68 MOTION to Certify Class Counts III, VI, and VIII (Liability Only), #69 Brief in Support of Motion, #70 MOTION to Certify Class Counts IV, V, and VII, #71 Brief in Support of Motion.All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (mec)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #70 MOTION to Certify Class Counts IV, V, and VII (Liability and Damages) . (Marritz, Nicholas)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Certify Class Counts IV, V, and VII (Liability and Damages) by All Plaintiffs. (Marritz, Nicholas)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #68 MOTION to Certify Class Counts III, VI, and VIII (Liability Only) . (Marritz, Nicholas)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Certify Class Counts III, VI, and VIII (Liability Only) by All Plaintiffs. (Marritz, Nicholas)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by all plaintiffs.(cav)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #62 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, #63 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Corrected Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Plaintiffs' Responses to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Second Revised Responses to Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' 2010 & 2011 Certified Applications)(Flores, Claudia)
November 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #62 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint . (Aldana, Michael)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Corrected Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex B-Jimenez v. GLK-Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex C-Jimenez v. GLK-Redline-Second Amended Complaint)(Karsh, Joshua)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Proposed Second Amended Complaint-Redline)(Karsh, Joshua)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas C Marritz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicholas Marritz (Marritz, Nicholas)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Written Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arroyo Jimenez Consent Form)(Karsh, Joshua)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing Written Consents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Razo Consent Form, #2 Exhibit Chiquito Consent Form)(Karsh, Joshua)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service (Karsh, Joshua)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JOINDER by All Plaintiffs Miguel Lancon Delgado and Antonio Ramirez Jimenez Consent Forms. (Karsh, Joshua)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing of Spanish Translations of Notice to Potential Fair Labor Standards Act Plaintiffs and Consent Forms (Attachments: #1 Spanish Translation of Notice and Consent Form, #2 Notice and Consent Form)(Flores, Claudia)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JOINDER by All Plaintiffs FLSA Consent Forms of: Jose Juan Valadez Campos, J. Jesus Romero Chavez and Jose Jurado Luva. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service)(Karsh, Joshua)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Modify the Relief Granted by the Court on 7/30/13. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION to Modify the Relief Granted by the Court in Its July 30, 2013 Order by All Plaintiffs. (Wilmes, Christopher)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Withdrawal of Previously Filed Expedited Motion for Limited Equitable Tolling (Wilmes, Christopher)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION Expedited Motion for Limited Equitable Tolling by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Stipulation and Tolling Agreement of 7/13/12 docket 26-1, #2 Exhibit B: Order of 5/2/13 in Arango v. Landrys, Inc.)(Karsh, Joshua)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 07/30/2013 granting #40 Motion for Conditional Certification and approval of a Notice to Potential FLSA Plaintiffs. Within 10 days of the date of this order Defendants will produce to plaintiffs, in a computer-readable format, the names, last-known addresses, telephone numbers, passport numbers, and visa numbers for all H-2B workers employed by the defendants in Bear Creek, Wisconsin in2010 and 2011. Plaintiffs are authorized to give notice of this lawsuit to all H-2B workers employed by the defendants in Bear Creek, Wisconsin in 2010 and 2011, and such notice may be sent once via first class mail to the conditionally-certified class. There will be a four-week opt-in period following the mailing of the notices. For purposes of the record, Plaintiffs shall file with the Court the Spanish translations of both the notice and consent forms. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #49 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 07/19/2013. All requests for discovery shall be served by a date sufficiently early so that all discovery in this case can be completed no later than November 29, 2013. As requested, Plaintiffs motion and supporting memorandum shall be filed on or before December 16, 2013; Defendants response is due on or before January 27, 2014; and Plaintiffs reply is due on or before February 17, 2014. Subject to the Courts rulings on Plaintiffs motions to authorize collective action notice and for certification of claims under Rule 23, the parties will have 60 days from the close of the collective action opt-in period to conduct any additional discovery related to new opt-in plaintiffs and 60 days from the Courts ruling on the Rule 23 motion to conduct any additional discovery related to additional class members. Summary judgment motions, by any party, must be served and filed no later than 60 days after the close of all discovery (including discovery following the Courts ruling on Plaintiffs collective action or Rule 23 motions). All provisions of the Scheduling Order (ECF No. 17) not explicitly addressed herein remain unchanged by this Order. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 34 Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Miara, Jenna)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #40 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Authorization of Court-Approved Notice to H-2B Workers Employed in 2010 and/or 2011 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Authorization of Court-Approved Notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Monica Garreton Chavez and Summarizing Chart, #2 Exhibit B-Receipts of Plaintiffs Expenses, #3 Exhibit C-LaborQuest Communications Regarding H-2B Travel and Visa Process, #4 Exhibit D-Deposition of Jorge Garcia, #5 Exhibit E-Deposition of Thomas Robinson, #6 Exhibit F-Defendants Electronic Communications Delaying H-2B workers in Bear Creek, #7 Exhibit G-Deposition of Rafael Jimenez Arroyo, #8 Exhibit H-Department of Labor Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs-Appellants in Rivera v. Peri & Sons Farms, Inc., No. 11-17365, #9 Exhibit I-Department of Labor Field Assistance Bulletin 2009-2, #10 Exhibit J-2010 and 2011 Defendant Applications for H-2B Workers, #11 Exhibit K-Deposition of Betty Miller, #12 Exhibit L-Deposition of Donna Lorge, #13 Exhibit M-Deposition of Gina Pahl, #14 Exhibit N-LaborQuest Documents regarding Defendants Responsibilities for H-2B Worker Expenses)(Flores, Claudia)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER approving #46 Stipulation signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 6/10/2013. Plaintiffs' reply brief in support of #40 MOTION for Authorization of Court-Approved Notice to H-2B Workers Employed in 2010 and/or 2011 will be due on or before 6/26/2013. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Plaintiffs' Time to Reply in Support of Their Motion for Authorization of Court Approved Notice to H-2B Workers Employed in 2010 and/or 2011 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Flores, Claudia)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Wilmes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher J. Wilmes (Wilmes, Christopher)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia M Flores on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Claudia M. Flores (Flores, Claudia)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Defendants re #40 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Authorization of Court-Approved Notice to H-2B Workers Employed in 2010 and/or 2011 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas J. Palmer)(Aldana, Michael)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Defendants' ANSWER to #39 Amended Complaint, by All Defendants.(Aldana, Michael)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #40 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Authorization of Court-Approved Notice to H-2B Workers Employed in 2010 and/or 2011 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A)Proposed Notice and Opt-In Consent, #2 Exhibit (B-1) Plaintiff Affidavits and Supporting Documentation, #3 Exhibit (B-2) Plaintiff Affidavits and Supporting Documentation, #4 Exhibit (B-3) Plaintiff Affidavits and Supporting Documentation, #5 Exhibit (B-4) Plaintiff Affidavits and Supporting Documentation, #6 Exhibit (B-5) Plaintiff Affidavits and Supporting Documentation, #7 Exhibit (C) Affidavit of Monica Garreton Chavez and Summarizing Chart, #8 Exhibit (D) Excerpts of Deposition Transcripts of Jorge Garcia and Thomas Robinson, #9 Exhibit (E) Defendants' Interrogatory Responses, #10 Exhibit (F) Department of Labor Field Assistance Bulletin 2009-2, #11 Exhibit (G) Unpublished Orders, #12 Exhibit (H) Non-governmental Organization Reports)(Karsh, Joshua)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Authorization of Court-Approved Notice to H-2B Workers Employed in 2010 and/or 2011 by All Plaintiffs. (Karsh, Joshua)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GLK Foods LLC, Ryan A Downs filed by all plaintiffs; adding plaintiffs Dario Flores Flores, Elias Ortiz Ramirez, Francisco Javier Jurado Chavez, Jesus Ricardo Arroyo Martinez, Marcelino Sifuentes Guerrero, Ramiro Martinez Santos, Raul Flores Flores, Alfredo Baca Lopez, Francisco Ruiz Figueroa, Jose Jiminez Quintana and Ruben Lancon Baca. (tlf) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(tlf)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3/26/2013 granting #36 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Defendants' response due 4/12/2013. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #37 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Motion #31 to Compel, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/22/2013. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Compel by All Plaintiffs. (Miara, Jenna)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Miara, Jenna)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #35 Stipulation for extension of time, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/18/2013. The due date for Defendants time to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is extended to March 22, 2013. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miara, Jenna)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/31/2013 Motions due by 9/18/2013. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER approving #32 Stipulation and GRANTING requested extension, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/05/2013. The due date is extended to March 15, 2013 for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aldana, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2013 (cav).
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aldana, Michael)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Compel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Miara Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Aldana Letter 1/7/2013, #3 Exhibit C - First Requests for Production, #4 Exhibit D - Miara Letter 11/9/2012, #5 Exhibit E - First Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit F - Answers to First Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit G - Responses to First Requests for Production, #8 Exhibit H - Revised Answers to First Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit I - Second Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit J - Second Requests for Production, #11 Exhibit K - Miara Letter 12/11/2012, #12 Exhibit L - Miara Letter 1/2/2013, #13 Exhibit M - Aldana Email 1/4/2013, #14 Exhibit N - Miara Letter 1/8/2013, #15 Exhibit O - Miara Email 1/9/2013)(Miara, Jenna)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #30 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Scheduling Order, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/29/2012. All requests for discovery shall be served by a date sufficiently early so that all discovery in this case can be completed no later than March 29, 2013. On or before May 17, 2013, all summary judgment motions shall be served andfiled. All provisions of the Scheduling Order #17 not explicitly addressed herein remain unchanged by this Order. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Scheduling Order by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miara, Jenna)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Karsh on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Joshua Karsh (Karsh, Joshua)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Attorney Mary M Rowland terminated, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 09/18/2012. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Counsel, Mary M. Rowland, to Withdraw as Counsel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Miara, Jenna)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error to Mary Rowland re #26 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw, Without Prejudice, Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and for Approval of Notice to 2010-2011 H-2B Workers; The Court prefers that documents be extracted directly from your word processing software whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (aw)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #26 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #18 Plaintiffs' Paintiffs' Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and for Approval of Notice to 2010-2011 H-2B Workers, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/16/2012. The motion to certify class, #18 is terminated. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw, Without Prejudice, Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed as a Collective Action and for Approval of Notice to 2010-2011 H-2B Workers by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Stipulation and Tolling Agreement)(Rowland, Mary)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER approving #23 Stipulation for extension of briefing, signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 07/09/2012. Defendants' brief in response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class to Proceed as a Collective Action and for Approval of Notice is extended to and including July 13, 2012. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DUPLICATE ENTRY - See #24 NOTICE of Appearance by Weeun Wang on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Weeun Wang (Wang, Weeun) Modified on 7/6/2012 (aw).
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Weeun Wang on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Weeun Wang (Wang, Weeun)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Class Certification by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Class Certification)(Aldana, Michael)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/18/2012 granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed 2/29/12 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Correct the Caption and For Leave to File a Corrected Exhibit B to the Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B-Corrected Exhibit B to Complaint (Consent Forms))(Rowland, Mary)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Consent Forms to be Claimants Under the Fair Labor Standards Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-FLSA Consent Forms)(Rowland, Mary)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #18 MOTION to Certify Class to Proceed as a Collective Action and for Approval of Notice to 2010-2011 H-2B Workers . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DOL Field Assistance Bulletin, #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiffs' Affidavits, #3 Exhibit C-DOL Certifications, #4 Exhibit D-Plaintiffs' Paystubs, #5 Exhibit E-Unpublished Orders, #6 Exhibit F-Proposed Notice)(Rowland, Mary)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Certify Class to Proceed as a Collective Action and for Approval of Notice to 2010-2011 H-2B Workers by All Plaintiffs. (Rowland, Mary)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: See minute entry dated 05/24/2012. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Initial disclosures due by 06/15/2012, Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2012, Discovery due by 2/28/2013, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 11/26/2012, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 1/9/2013, Motions due by 4/12/2013 (cav)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 5/24/2012. The Court will enter a separate scheduling order for cases 12-C-209 and 12-C-210. (Tape #052412) (cav)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan Notice of Rule 26(f) Conference and Joint Proposed 26(f)(3) Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Proposed Protective Order)(Rowland, Mary)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2012 09:00 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26(f) report due 5/17/2012. The court will initiate the call; Counsel are to provide the Office of the Clerk with the telephone number at which they can be reached. (cc: all counsel)(tlf)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants.(Aldana, Michael)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Aldana, Michael)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Aldana on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael Aldana; Sean Scullen; Nicholas Anderson (Aldana, Michael)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by All Plaintiffs. (Rowland, Mary)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Ryan A Downs served on 3/4/2012, answer due 3/26/2012. (Miara, Jenna)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. GLK Foods LLC served on 3/2/2012, answer due 3/23/2012. (Miara, Jenna)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Miara, Jenna)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (aw)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Miara on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Jenna Miara (Miara, Jenna)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J Behar on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Jose J. Behar (Behar, Jose)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Piers on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Piers (Piers, Matthew)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M Rowland on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Mary M. Rowland (Rowland, Mary)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against all Defendants by all Plaintiffs. ( Filing Fee PAID $350 receipt number 0757-1444224) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 See Attachment # 6 for Corrected Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Rowland, Mary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2012: #6 Corrected Exhibit B) (tlf).
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Goodstein to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jurado Jimenez et al v. GLK Foods LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Jurado Jimenez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Nieto Chavez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Jurado Ramirez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Francisco Yerena Gonzalez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jimenez Jurado
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oswaldo Zuniga Medina
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Landin Garcia
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Ruiz Mendoza
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ponce Gonzalez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Jurado Jurado
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asael Quintana Ramirez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Jurado Rangel
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristobal Martinez Velez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nieto Jimenez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Armando Arroyo Garcia
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Robles Medina
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Rosas Jurado
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Rosas Rivera
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Nunez Perez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Jurado Ortiz
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Arroyo Ortiz
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Jesus Jimenez Rosas
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Jesus Ortiz Martinez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Jesus Robles Medina
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Salud Rodriguez Ramirez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Saul Jimenez Rosas
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Eduardo Santiago Garcia
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Martinez Gallardo
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Ortiz Arriaga
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Sifuentes Guerrero
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Dimas Jimenez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alberto Garcia Camargo
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alberto Martinez Gonzalez
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Flores Perez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Ponce Gonzalez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Baca Guevara
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose David Flores Mendoza
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Javier Chavez Rangel
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jurado Jurado
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Lopez Valencia
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lorenzo Esparza Barron
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Ortega Paredes
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Mendez Baca
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ramon Martinez Palmas
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Roberto Martinez Moreno
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Almanza Sanchez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Godinez Lopez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Cesar Cabrera Guerrero
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucio Loredo Hernandez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Andres Munoz Espinosa
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Rivas Quintana
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Chavez Jimenez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Ortiz Martinez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazario Rodriguez Guzman
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Tapia Rodriguez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Arroyo Lopez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Jurado Rosas
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Ramirez Lancon
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Rodriguez Ramirez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosendo Aguilar Cardenas
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Nieto Jimenez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Baca Jurado
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Mary M Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dario Flores Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elias Ortiz Ramirez
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Javier Jurado Chavez
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Ricardo Arroyo Martinez
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelino Sifuentes Guerrero
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Martinez Santos
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Flores Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Baca Lopez
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Ruiz Figueroa
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jiminez Quintana
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Lancon Baca
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Juan Valadez Campos
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Omar Silva Razo
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Jurado Luva
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Ramirez Jimenez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Mendoza Chiquito
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J Jesus Romero Chavez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Antonio Arroyo Jimenez
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Lancon Delgado
Represented By: Ali A Beydoun
Represented By: Bruce Goldstein
Represented By: Caryn C Lederer
Represented By: Christopher J Wilmes
Represented By: Claudia M Flores
Represented By: Jenna Miara
Represented By: Jose J Behar
Represented By: Joshua Karsh
Represented By: Matthew J Piers
Represented By: Nicholas C Marritz
Represented By: Weeun Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLK Foods LLC
Represented By: Sean M Scullen
Represented By: Michael Aldana
Represented By: Nicholas O Anderson
Represented By: Steven M Kruzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan A Downs
Represented By: Sean M Scullen
Represented By: Michael Aldana
Represented By: Nicholas O Anderson
Represented By: Steven M Kruzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?