National Graphics Inc v. Brax Ltd et al

Plaintiff: National Graphics Inc
Defendant: Brax Ltd, Dynamic Drinkware LLC, Capitol Cups Inc and Service Litho-Print Inc
Case Number: 1:2012cv01119
Filed: November 2, 2012
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Waukesha
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2016 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3-18-16 denying 229 Motion to Take Deposition ; denying 229 Motion ; granting 235 Motion for Protective Order. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
March 1, 2016 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3-1-16 granting in part and denying in part 219 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
December 22, 2015 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12-22-15 granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk to set scheduling conference. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
June 24, 2015 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 173 MOTION for Leave to File Oversized Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Service Litho-Print Inc, Brax Ltd, and Dynamic Drinkware LLC AND DENYING 174 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Service L itho-Print Inc, Brax Ltd, and Dynamic Drinkware LLC, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 06/24/2015. The denial, however, is without prejudice, and defendants may supplement the record with information that would establish good cause to obta in the relief they seek. Counsel will be allowed 21 days within which to show cause why the material it designated confidential should remain under seal. If counsel fail to show cause within that time, the Clerk is directed to unseal the material. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 10, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 10-10-14 denying 90 Motion for Reconsideration. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
May 19, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 5-19-14 denying 93 Motion for Protective Order; granting 95 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 101 Motion for Leave to File. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
December 4, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion to Strike but granting the request to file a sur-reply, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/04/2013. Plaintiff is therefore directed to file its sur-reply within five days of the date of this order. See Order for full detail. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Graphics Inc v. Brax Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Graphics Inc
Represented By: John P Fredrickson
Represented By: Michael T Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brax Ltd
Represented By: Patrick M Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynamic Drinkware LLC
Represented By: Patrick M Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Cups Inc
Represented By: Jonathan T Smies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Litho-Print Inc
Represented By: Joseph T Leone
Represented By: Joseph A Ranney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?