Makhsous v. Wisconsin Department of Health Services et al

Plaintiff: Xuejun Makhsous
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Health Services, Marinette County, Robin Elsner, Pam Daye, Colleen Rohde, Michelle Steffen, Kathy Lyons, Cari Gast, Phyllis Witter, Alfred Johnson, Care Wisconsin and Lakeland Care District
Case Number: 1:2018cv00587
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Office: Green Bay Office
County: Marinette
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Relief; granting 41 Motion to Reopen Case. The 8/3/2018 judgment is vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 30 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended pleading. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
August 3, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 8/2/2018 granting 30 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (cc: all counsel via CM/ECF, Xuejun Makhsous via U.S. Mail ) (Griesbach, William)
July 31, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C. Griesbach on 7/31/18. Plaintiff's 35 Second Amended Complaint is STRICKEN from this action for failure to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Civil L. R. 15. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Xuejun Makhsous )(Griesbach, William)
June 26, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C. Griesbach on 6/26/18. Makhsous's request to amend the complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to docket the 26 proposed complaint as an amended complaint. Lakeland Care District and Care Wisconsin's motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 9 and 14 ) are DENIED as moot. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Xuejun Makhsous)(Griesbach, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makhsous v. Wisconsin Department of Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuejun Makhsous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Represented By: Christopher J Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinette County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Elsner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Daye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Rohde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Lyons
Represented By: Christopher J Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cari Gast
Represented By: Christopher J Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Witter
Represented By: Christopher J Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Johnson
Represented By: Christopher J Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Care District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?