Buckley v. Kamps et al

Plaintiff: James Buckley
Defendant: PAT KAMPS, COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF RETIREES OF LANGLADE COUNTY, INC. and Community Association of Retirees of Langlade County Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv01425
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/1/18. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 11/1/2018. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/15/2018. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of parties due by 1/2/2019. Fact Discovery due by 8/15/2019, Expert Discovery due 7/15/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 3/1/2019. Defendants Expert Witness List due by 4/30/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2019. (Tape #110118) (lh)
October 31, 2018 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference is rescheduled as to TIME ONLY Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 09:30 AM (CT) By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (lh)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by James Buckley. (Buckley, Richard)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Riebe, Ryan)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: RULE 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel)(cav)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants.(Riebe, Ryan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J Riebe on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan J. Riebe (Riebe, Ryan)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Buckley. Community Association of Retirees of Langlade County Inc served on 9/13/2018. (Buckley, Richard)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Buckley. Pat Kamps served on 9/13/2018. (Buckley, Richard)
September 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mac)
September 13, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint, filed by James Buckley ; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance(mac)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by James Buckley. (Buckley, Richard)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Community Association of Retirees of Langlade County Inc, Pat Kamps by James Buckley. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2918512) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons Pat Kamps, #3 Summons Community Association of Retirees)(Buckley, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). Modified on 9/13/2018 (mac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. Kamps et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAT KAMPS
Represented By: Ryan J Riebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION OF RETIREES OF LANGLADE COUNTY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Association of Retirees of Langlade County Inc
Represented By: Ryan J Riebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Buckley
Represented By: Richard A Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?