A.R. v. Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System et al
Plaintiff: A.R.
Defendant: Michael Beitz and Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System
Case Number: 1:2018cv01554
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs regarding Civil L.R. 10(c ) Motion to Continue to Proceed Using a Pseudonym, Michael Beitz (Kennelly, Mary)
November 23, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #12 MOTION Civil L.R. 10(c ) motion to continue to proceed in this matter using a pseudonym . (Kennelly, Mary)
November 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION Civil L.R. 10(c ) motion to continue to proceed in this matter using a pseudonym by All Plaintiffs. (Kennelly, Mary)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER approving #7 Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/1/2018. The answer deadline for all defendants in this case is 12/7/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System - Waiver sent on 10/8/2018. (Kennelly, Mary)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Conlin, Shannon)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kennelly, Mary)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Answer Deadline by Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. (Bensky, Anne)
October 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon A Conlin on behalf of Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. Attorney(s) appearing: Shannon A. Conlin and Anne M. Bensky (Conlin, Shannon)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M Bensky on behalf of Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System. Attorney(s) appearing: Anne M. Benksy and Shannon A. Conlin (Bensky, Anne)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.R.. Michael Beitz served on 10/10/2018. (Kennelly, Mary)
October 4, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mac)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by A.R.. This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Kennelly, Mary)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by A.R.. (Kennelly, Mary)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by A.R.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2935598) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Michael Beitz, #3 Summons UW Board of Regents)(Kennelly, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.R. v. Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of The University of Wisconsin System
Represented By: Shannon A Conlin
Represented By: Anne M Bensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.
Represented By: Mary E Kennelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?