PTP OneClick LLC v. Avalara Inc

Plaintiff: PTP OneClick LLC
Defendant: Avalara Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv01671
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Avalara Inc of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Clearswift Decision)(Keese, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #20 Declaration ; Attachments to documents should be clearly described. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the Judge Griesbach's Instructions for Litigants found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
December 12, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Avalara Inc re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to Western District of Washington (at Seattle) . (Lewis, Brandon)
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Daniel T. Keese in Support of Avalara, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lewis, Brandon)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Avalara Inc re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Lewis, Brandon)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Keese on behalf of Avalara Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel T. Keese (Keese, Daniel)
November 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J McBrayer on behalf of Avalara Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan J. McBrayer (McBrayer, Ryan)
November 29, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #13 Declaration; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text (Exhibit Exhibit). In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 UNPUBLISHED Decision in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer filed by PTP OneClick LLC (Attachments: #1 Adams Arms v. Unified Weapon Systems, #2 Adams v. Newell Rubbermaid, #3 Ameritox v. Millennium Health, #4 Ancora Technologies v. HTC America, #5 Aon v. Heffernan, #6 David Frye v. Indiana Concrete, #7 Fabio v. Diversified Consultants, #8 Holmes v. Sids Sealants, #9 Illumina v. Affymetrix, #10 In re Aftermarket Filters, #11 Luck v. OTX Acquisition, #12 MCA Records v. Allison, #13 Muzzarelli v. Landrys Restaurants, #14 Rosman Adjustment v. Bernay, #15 Simonoff v. Kaplan, #16 Studio and Partners v. KI, #17 Vendavo v. Price)(Smies, Jonathan)
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Pavlos Pavlou in Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Smies, Jonathan)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PTP OneClick LLC re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to Western District of Washington (at Seattle) . (Smies, Jonathan)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Collin Kurtenbach in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Patent Examiner Rejection, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - PTP Response to Non-Final Rejection, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - PTP Appeal Brief, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Examiner Response to Appeal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - PTAB Decision, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Berkheimer Memo, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Avalara 10-Q, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Avalara Press Release, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Avalara Locations, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Avalara Press Release, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - 2018 Federal Court Management Statistics, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Avalara Employee Number, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Avalara Market Capitalization)(Smies, Jonathan)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by PTP OneClick LLC re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Smies, Jonathan)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M Lewis on behalf of Avalara Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon M. Lewis (Lewis, Brandon)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Brandon M. Lewis in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Part 1 of File History, #2 Exhibit 2: Part 2 of File History)(Lewis, Brandon)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by Avalara Inc re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Lewis, Brandon)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Avalara Inc. (Lewis, Brandon)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Marshal Kushniruk in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Lewis, Brandon)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Avalara Inc re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to Western District of Washington (at Seattle) . (Lewis, Brandon)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) to Western District of Washington (at Seattle) by Avalara Inc. (Lewis, Brandon)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by PTP OneClick LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Smies, Jonathan)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PTP OneClick LLC. Avalara Inc served on 10/23/2018. (Smies, Jonathan)
October 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Avalara Inc. (mac)
October 23, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (mac)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
October 22, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by PTP OneClick LLC. (Smies, Jonathan)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Avalara Inc by PTP OneClick LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2949470) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Avalara Wisconsin Certificate of Authority, #2 Exhibit 2 - Confidentiality Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - '915 Patent, #4 Exhibit 4 - Avalara Webpage Product Integration Advertisement, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smies, Jonathan) Modified on 10/23/2018 (mac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PTP OneClick LLC v. Avalara Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PTP OneClick LLC
Represented By: Jonathan T Smies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalara Inc
Represented By: Ryan J McBrayer
Represented By: Daniel T Keese
Represented By: Brandon M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?