Laraia et al v. Kimberly-Clark Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Steven Laraia
Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Corporation, John Doe Insurance Companies 1-10 and John Doe Defendants 1-9
Undetermined: Drivers Management, LLC and Drivers Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01936
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION (Letter Request) by Drivers Management LLC for additional time to file brief on Motion to Dismiss. (Kirsch, Ashton) Modified event text on 1/17/2019 (lh).
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM against Plaintiff filed by Drivers Management LLC. (Kirsch, Ashton)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Drivers Management LLC. (Kirsch, Ashton)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashton T Kirsch on behalf of Drivers Management LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Ashton T. Kirsch (Kirsch, Ashton)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Sundelius, Jacob)
January 3, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #8 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by Steven Laraia; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. The incorrect case number appears on the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (mac)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Steven Laraia re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Tyroler, Isaac)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Sundelius, Jacob)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Sundelius, Jacob)
December 13, 2018 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation, #4 Brief in Support of Motion filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Sundelius, Jacob)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 DOCUMENT REFILED. BRIEF in Support filed by Kimberly-Clark Corporation re #3 MOTION to Dismiss . (Sundelius, Jacob)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 DOCUMENT REFILED. MOTION to Dismiss by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Sundelius, Jacob)
December 10, 2018 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (lh)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kimberly-Clark Corporation. (Sundelius, Jacob)
December 7, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kimberly-Clark Corporation from Winnebago County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18-CV-910 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2984883) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint)(Sundelius, Jacob) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laraia et al v. Kimberly-Clark Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Drivers Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Drivers Management LLC
Represented By: Ashton T Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Laraia
Represented By: Isaac I Tyroler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Represented By: Jacob R Sundelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?