Kruse et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Kruse
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Undetermined: Alex M Azar, II and State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv01978
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REMANDING CASE based upon the stipulation of the parties signed by Chief Judge William C. Griesbach on 1/4/19. A certified copy of remand order and certified copy of docket sent to Oconto County Circuit Court on 1/7/19. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Remand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Remand)(Zylstra, Sarah)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zylstra, Sarah)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Crossclaim re #4 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Zylstra, Sarah)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/21/18. The State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services shall be re-designated to be an Involuntary Plaintiff without further notice. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Zylstra, Sarah)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED Proposed Order to Redesignate DHS filed by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Herman, Lara)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service DHS Certificate of Service)(Herman, Lara)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara M Herman on behalf of State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Lara M. Herman (Herman, Lara)
December 14, 2018 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (cms)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Zylstra, Sarah)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Oconto County Circuit Court, Case Number: 18-CV-195 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2990510) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint from Oconto County)(Zylstra, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruse et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Kruse
Represented By: David H Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Sarah A Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Represented By: Lara M Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?