Amo v. Hammer
Petitioner: Nana Yaw Amo
Respondent: LT Klink Hammer and Y Ochoa
Case Number: 1:2018cv01992
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Copy of Order #13 , Judgment #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Nan Yaw Amo (cav)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/31/2019. (cc: all counsel)(cav)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nana Yaw Amo. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF filed by Nana Yaw Amo re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (lh)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF filed by Nana Yaw Amo re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (lh)
January 7, 2019 FILING FEE Received: $5, receipt number GB4689005366. (lh)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 12/28/2018 Denying #4 , #7 Motions for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Amo will have until 1/18/2019 to pay the $5.00 filing fee. (cc: Petitioner via US Mail) (Griesbach, William)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF filed by Nana Yaw Amo re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cms)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nana Yaw Amo. (cms)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Nana Yaw Amo. (cms)
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Nana Yaw Amo. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cms)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from the Court to the court regarding the filing fee. Sent letter to plaintiff regarding filing fee. (cc: All Counsel) (cms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2018: #1 Letter) (cms).
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Nana Yaw Amo. (cms)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nana Yaw Amo. (cms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2018: #1 Exhibits to Petition) (cms).
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph, the request to proceed without prepaying, and trust account statement all to be filed within 21 days. Mailed to petitioner. (cms)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 BRIEF PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Nana Yaw Amo. (cms) Modified on 12/18/2018 (cms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amo v. Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nana Yaw Amo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LT Klink Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Y Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?