Denofre v. Chek Systems et al

Plaintiff: Rebecca S Denofre and Rebecca DeWitt
Defendant: Chek Systems and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 1:2018cv02040
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/24/2019. (cc: Plaintiff via US Mail)(mac)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCREENING ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/24/2019 DISMISSING Plaintiff's amended complaint. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. (cc: Plaintiff via US Mail)(Griesbach, William)
January 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by Rebecca S Denofre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (with bookmarks))(tlf)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/22/2019 Denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Lawyer Referral Information) (cc: Plaintiff via US Mail) (Griesbach, William)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Rebecca S Denofre. (lh)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 1/3/2019 Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days or the case will be dismissed. (cc: Plaintiff via US Mail) (Griesbach, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Mailed to plaintiff. (cms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from plaintiff regarding proof of mailing. (cms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 EXHIBITS by Rebecca S Denofre. (cms) Modified on 1/2/2019- some exhibits are illegible. (cms).
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Rebecca S Denofre. (cms)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rebecca S Denofre. jury demand (cms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denofre v. Chek Systems et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chek Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca S Denofre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?