Mayes et al v. Selvick Marine Towing Corp et al
Plaintiff: McGinnis, Inc., Signal Administration Inc. and Ronald G Mayes
Defendant: Barge Vessel Donny S, John Doe(s), ABC Insurance Company, Selvick Marine Towing Corp. and Selvick Marine Towing Corp
Undetermined: Signal Administration Inc and McGinnis Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00188
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference is Rescheduled to 4/9/2019 at 09:20 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (cc: all counsel)(mac)
April 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Resimius on behalf of McGinnis Inc, Signal Administration Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jay D. Patton (Resimius, Anthony)
March 28, 2019 Filing 25 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Selvick Marine Towing Corp. (McCabe, Adam)
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Crossclaim re #6 of McGinnis Inc. and Signal Mutual Indemnity Association, Ltd. filed by Ronald G Mayes. (Lonzo, Thomas)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order approving stipulation of substitution of counsel signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 3/2/7/19. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 27, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION Granting Substitution of Attorney by Ronald G Mayes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney)(Lonzo, Thomas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam H McCabe on behalf of Selvick Marine Towing Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Adam H. McCabe (McCabe, Adam)
March 26, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #20 Stipulation filed by Ronald G Mayes ; The proposed order should be filed as an attachment to the stipulation. Please ensure that the proposed order has been emailed to the proposed email box for the assigned judge in Word or WordPerfect format. This document does NOT need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Ronald G Mayes. (Lonzo, Thomas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J Lonzo on behalf of Ronald G Mayes. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas J. Lonzo (Lonzo, Thomas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 Selvick Marine Towing Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Involuntary Plaintiffs filed by Selvick Marine Towing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Notice of Filing)(Belgrade, Steven)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel) RULE 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference is rescheduled for 4/5/2019 10:30 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #15 STIPULATION to adjourn the Rule 16 scheduling conference for at least twenty-one days and to extend the deadline to file the Rule 26(f) report, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 03/08/2019. The parties shall submit the Rule 26(f) report on or before March 28, 2019. The Clerk is directed to reschedule the Rule 16 scheduling conference accordingly. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION To Adjourn Rule 16 Scheduling Conference And Extend Deadline To File Rule 26(f) Report by All Plaintiffs. (Hale, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Signal Administration Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Resimius, Anthony)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Selvick Marine Towing Corp. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pless, Erik)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hale, Christopher)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T Hale on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher T. Hale (Hale, Christopher)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Selvick Marine Towing Corp.(Belgrade, Steven)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Signal Administration Inc. (Resimius, Anthony)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by McGinnis Inc. (Resimius, Anthony)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Defendants Selvick Marine Towing Corp. and Barge Vessel Donny S. AND CROSS-CLAIM Against Plaintiff Ronald G. Mayes filed by McGinnis Inc, Signal Administration Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Resimius, Anthony) Modified on 2/13/2019 (amb).
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik J Pless on behalf of Selvick Marine Towing Corp. Attorney(s) appearing: Erik J. Pless (Pless, Erik)
February 5, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (bx)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Selvick Marine Towing Corp.. (Belgrade, Steven)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John A O'Donnell on behalf of Selvick Marine Towing Corp.. Attorney(s) appearing: John A. O'Donnell (O'Donnell, John)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven B Belgrade on behalf of Selvick Marine Towing Corp.. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven B. Belgrade (Belgrade, Steven)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Selvick Marine Towing Corp. from Circuit Court of Door County, Case Number: 2018CV000209 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3026231) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Filing)(Belgrade, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayes et al v. Selvick Marine Towing Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barge Vessel Donny S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selvick Marine Towing Corp.
Represented By: Steven B Belgrade
Represented By: John A O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selvick Marine Towing Corp
Represented By: Steven B Belgrade
Represented By: John A O'Donnell
Represented By: Erik J Pless
Represented By: Adam H McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McGinnis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signal Administration Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald G Mayes
Represented By: Stephen M Cox
Represented By: Thomas J Lonzo
Represented By: Christopher T Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Signal Administration Inc
Represented By: Anthony J Resimius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: McGinnis Inc
Represented By: Anthony J Resimius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?