Davis v. Schneider National Carriers Inc
Plaintiff: Schaffer Davis
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00878
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 7/23/19. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Schaffer Davis)(cav)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Schaffer Davis) (Griesbach, William)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 6/19/2019 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee and dismissing #1 Pro Se Complaint without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint by 7/19/2019. (cc: Schaffer Davis via U.S. Mail) (Griesbach, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Schaffer Davis re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (cav)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Schaffer Davis. #1 Sealed Unredacted Motion to Proceed Without Prepaying Filing Fee (cav).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Schneider National Carriers Inc filed by Schaffer Davis. (cav)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Schneider National Carriers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schaffer Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?