Drown v. Sinclair Plumbing Inc
Plaintiff: Brady Drown
Defendant: Sinclair Plumbing, Inc. and Sinclair Plumbing Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00885
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2019. Initial Disclosures due by 9/9/2019, Discovery due by 2/10/2020, Motions due by 12/16/2019, Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/6/2020, Motions in Limine due by 3/6/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2020 03:00 PM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach., Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 08:30 AM before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. (Tape #080819) (cav)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Brady Drown. (Madden, Caitlin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 09:50 AM By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(cav)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Sinclair Plumbing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil L.R. 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Bouressa, Terence)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on 6/26/2019 by Terence Bouressa (Madden, Caitlin)
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Sinclair Plumbing Inc. (mac)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Brady Drown. (Madden, Caitlin)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Sinclair Plumbing, Inc. by Brady Drown. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3138382) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Madden, Caitlin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drown v. Sinclair Plumbing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Plumbing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Plumbing Inc
Represented By: Terence J Bouressa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brady Drown
Represented By: Caitlin M Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?