Apsey v. MPJ Trucking Co. LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Apsey
Defendant: MPJ Trucking Co. LLC, Michael Grassl, Soper Trucking LLC and MPJ Trucking Co LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00925
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/27/2019, Discovery due by 4/26/2020, Plaintiffs Expert Witness List due by 10/25/2019, Defendants Expert Witness List due by 12/25/2019, Motions due by 3/27/2020, Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 9/27/2019. (Tape #082219) (cav)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by David Apsey. (Luzi, Scott)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)RULE 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 09:00 AM By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(cav)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand With Notice of Retainer by Michael Grassl, MPJ Trucking Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Van Lieshout, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Soper Trucking LLC.(Culp, Peter)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Culp on behalf of Soper Trucking LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Peter J. Culp (Culp, Peter)
June 25, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (cav)
June 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Michael Grassl, MPJ Trucking Co LLC, Soper Trucking LLC. (cav)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by David Apsey. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of David Apsey. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi (Luzi, Scott)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by David Apsey. (Luzi, Scott)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Michael Grassl, MPJ Trucking Co. LLC, Soper Trucking LLC by David Apsey. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3145983) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons MPJ Trucking Co. LLC, #3 Summons Michael Grassl, #4 Summons Soper Trucking LLC)(Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apsey v. MPJ Trucking Co. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPJ Trucking Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Grassl
Represented By: David J Van Lieshout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soper Trucking LLC
Represented By: Peter J Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPJ Trucking Co LLC
Represented By: David J Van Lieshout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Apsey
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?