Petrie v. Saul
Plaintiff: Codie E Petrie
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00941
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin APPROVING #25 Stipulated Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an award of attorney fees in the sum of $7,856.21 shall be paid by Defendant in full satisfaction and settlement of any and all claims Plaintiff may have pursuant to the EAJA. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
July 27, 2020 Filing 25 Stipulated MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Catherine)
May 1, 2020 Filing 24 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin re #22 Joint Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED that this case be remanded to the Agency pursuant to the fourth sentence of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) for further proceedings and that judgment be entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
April 30, 2020 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Remand for Further Proceedings Pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 USC 405(g) by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Catherine)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The court finding good cause, the Commissioner's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #20 ) is granted. The new schedule is as follows: The defendant shall respond no later than May 1, 2020. The plaintiff may reply no later than May 15, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Defendant's Attorney, Catherine L. Gibbons in Support of Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension (Gibbons, Catherine)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief (UNOPPOSED) by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Catherine)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/3/2020. The court finding good cause, the Commissioner's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #17 ) is granted. The new schedule is as follows: The defendant shall respond no later than April 1, 2020. The plaintiff may reply no later than April 16, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (kmm)
March 2, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Defendant's Attorney, Catherine L. Gibbons in Support of Defendant's First Unopposed Motion for Extension (Gibbons, Catherine)
March 2, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief (UNOPPOSED) by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Catherine)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Leigh Gibbons on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Catherine L. Gibbons (Gibbons, Catherine)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiffs Brief Plaintiffs Brief in Support of Her Motion to Reverse the Decision of the Commissioner of Social Security by Codie E Petrie. (Schultz, Barry)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript, #4 Transcript, #5 Transcript, #6 Transcript, #7 Transcript, #8 Transcript, #9 Transcript, #10 Transcript, #11 Transcript, #12 Transcript, #13 Transcript, #14 Transcript, #15 Transcript, #16 Transcript, #17 Transcript, #18 Transcript, #19 Transcript, #20 Transcript, #21 Transcript, #22 Transcript, #23 Transcript, #24 Transcript, #25 Transcript, #26 Transcript, #27 Transcript, #28 Transcript, #29 Transcript, #30 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Andrew Saul (Pawlak, Brian)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due January 21, 2020; Defendant's response due March 2, 2020; Plaintiff's reply due March 17, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/8/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Codie E Petrie. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schultz, Barry)
October 7, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed no later than October 11, 2019. The form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE: Due to the unavailability of Magistrate Judge David E. Jones, the magistrate judge now assigned to this case is William E. Duffin. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin to be filed within 21 days. The consent/refusal form is available a t the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 7/8/2019. (blr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/5/2019. (blr)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/1/2019 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
July 1, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Codie E Petrie. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schultz, Barry)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Codie E Petrie. (Schultz, Barry)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Codie E Petrie. (Schultz, Barry)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Codie E Petrie (Attachments: #1 AC decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schultz, Barry)
June 27, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrie v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Codie E Petrie
Represented By: Barry A Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Catherine Leigh Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?