United States of America v. Cartwright et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cofina Financial LLC, Scott P Cartwright, Russell W Cartwright, CHS Capital LLC, Jacqueline J Cartwright, Carol A Cartwright and GreenStone Farm Credit Services FLCA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01000
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to Carol A Cartwright, Jacqueline J Cartwright, Russell W Cartwright, Scott P Cartwright. (lh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stewart, Carter)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America of Dismissal of Defendant Cofina Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Stewart, Carter)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHS Capital LLC - Waiver sent on 7/15/2019. (Stewart, Carter)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit C - Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit D - Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Financing Statement, #6 Exhibit F - Continuation Statement, #7 Exhibit G - Mortgage, #8 Exhibit H - Mortgage, #9 Exhibit I - Mortgage, #10 Exhibit J - Demand for Payment, #11 Exhibit K - Statement of Account, #12 Exhibit L - Land Contract (home), #13 Exhibit M - Land Contract (farm), #14 Exhibit N - Quit Claim Deed, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Carter)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cartwright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cofina Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott P Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell W Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHS Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline J Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol A Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreenStone Farm Credit Services FLCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carter Bryan Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?