Staten v. United States of America
Petitioner: Vernell L Staten
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01007
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 FEE NOTICE AND ORDER of USCA re #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Vernell L Staten. (mac)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 19-2640 re: #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Vernell L Staten. (mac)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (dl)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Pro Se Cover Letter re: #6 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dl)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Judgment by Vernell L Staten. (cc: all counsel) (dl)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Sent to Vernell L. Staten at Pekin FCI marked refused unable to forward, located Returned as Undeliverable re #4 Judgment, #3 Order. Re-issued on 8/5/19 to Vernell L. Staten at Fort Dix Federal Correctional Institution (East), Inmate Mail/Parcels, PO Box 2000, Fort Dix, NJ 08640 (lh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 7/22/19. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Vernell Staten)(lh)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 7/22/19. Staten's Section 2255 motion is DENIED and the case is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Vernell L. Staten)(Griesbach, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF filed by Vernell L Staten re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) by Vernell L Staten.. (cms)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) by Vernell L Staten.(cms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staten v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Keith S Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vernell L Staten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?