Rothermel v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shelley Rothermel
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01011
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/12/2019. By 11/4/2019, Defendant to serve on Plaintiff copy of proposed Notice of Mailing and Preservation of Rights and copy of the transcript of administrative proceedings. By 11/18/2019, parties to meet and confer in good faith effort to resolve matter. Plaintiff's brief due by 1/17/2020; Defendant's response due by 3/17/2020; Plaintiff's reply due by 4/7/2020. Briefs are subject to specified page limitations. No extensions of time for filing of briefs will be granted. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED Briefing Schedule filed by Andrew Saul. (Hugo, Megan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C Hugo on behalf of Andrew Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Megan C. Hugo (Hugo, Megan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 8/5/2019. (blr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/1/2019. (blr)
July 29, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/22/2019 GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Shelley Rothermel. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Shelley Rothermel. (Duncan, Dana)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Shelley Rothermel. (Duncan, Dana)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Shelley Rothermel (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothermel v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Rothermel
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Megan C Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?