Ashenbrenner v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lucas James Ashenbrenner and Lucas Ashenbrenner
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv01098
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 8/7/2019. (blr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/5/2019. (blr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Skutch Cohn on behalf of Andrew Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due November 13, 2019; Defendant's response due December 23, 2019; Plaintiff's reply due January 7, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/2/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 1, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/31/2019 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lucas James Ashenbrenner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Duncan, Dana)
July 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Lucas James Ashenbrenner. (Duncan, Dana)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lucas James Ashenbrenner. (Duncan, Dana)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Lucas James Ashenbrenner (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duncan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashenbrenner v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Emily Skutch Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas James Ashenbrenner
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Ashenbrenner
Represented By: Dana W Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?